Case Information: 55261 | |||
Short Caption: | MARTINEZ (JOSE) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 53855 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C250216 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 11/19/2010 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/14/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 10-01254 | |
01/14/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/01/2010 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. Docketing Statement | 10-02688 | |
02/01/2010 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 12/16/08; 12/19/08; 3/26/09; 4/2/09; 9/10/09; 10/6/09; 10/8/09; 10/12/09; 10/13/09; 10/14/09; and 12/10/09. To Court Reporters: Kiara Schmidt and Rachelle Hamilton. | 10-02689 | |
02/19/2010 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Kiara Schmidt stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 12/16/08 and 12/19/08. | 10-04555 | |
03/04/2010 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Rachelle Hamilton stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 3/26/09, 4/2/09, 9/10/09, 10/6/09, 10/8/09, 12/10/09. | 10-05766 | |
03/04/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Court Reporter Rachelle Hamilton. | 10-05786 | |
03/08/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion and Revising Briefing Schedule. Court recorder Rachelle Hamilton's certificate of delivery due: April 1, 2010. Opening Brief and Appendix due: June 3, 2010. | 10-06001 | |
03/18/2010 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Rachelle Hamilton stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 10/12/09, 10/13/09, 10/14/09. | 10-07268 | |
05/27/2010 | Motion | Filed Stipulation. | 10-13842 | |
05/27/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Filed Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief and Appendix due: July 2, 2010. | 10-13843 | |
07/02/2010 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 10-17297 | |
07/02/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 1 | 10-17298 | |
07/02/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 2 | 10-17302 | |
07/02/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 3 | 10-17303 | |
08/02/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 10-19846 | |
08/02/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Filed Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. The motion/stipulation to enlarge time to file answering brief is approved. Due date: September 1, 2010. | 10-19847 | |
09/01/2010 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 10-22435 | |
09/29/2010 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to File Reply Brief. (30) days. | 10-25264 | |
09/30/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Reply Brief due date: November 1, 2010. | 10-25269 | |
10/28/2010 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | 10-28295 | |
11/19/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. | 10-30382 | |
11/19/2010 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
01/13/2011 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Reversal and Remand. "ORDER the judgment of conviction REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." | 11-01299 | |
02/07/2011 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 11-03811 | |
02/07/2011 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
02/17/2011 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on February 14, 2011. | 11-03811 |