judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ROGERS (CORNELIUS) VS. STATE

Case Information: 51514
Short Caption:ROGERS (CORNELIUS) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 44179 , 49054 , 59335 , 66081 , 79814 , 79814-COA , 81712
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C175461Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:04/16/2010How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/30/2008Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
04/30/2008Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 08-10708
05/15/2008Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 6/7/04, 6/18/04, 6/21/04, 10/11/04, 11/22/04, 1/27/06, 3/20/06, 5/19/06, 7/17/06, 7/26/06, 8/2/06, 8/16/06, 8/28/06, 8/31/06, 2/2/07, 12/26/07, 12/29/07, 2/25/08, 3/31/08. To Court Reporter: Elizabeth Shea, Gina Shrader, Loree Murray, Loree Gallegos, Kristen Lunkwitz, Gayle Pichierri, Yvette Lester. 08-12294
05/15/2008Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 08-12298
06/04/2008MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension of Time to Prepare and File Transcript. Court Reporter Lester. 08-14106
06/16/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Ms. Lester: 30 days to file a certificate acknowledging delivery of the transcripts. [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] 08-15319
06/16/2008TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 1/27/06. Court Reporter: Lunkwitz. 12/29/07, 2/25/08, 3/31/08. Court Reporter: Lester. 2/25/08. 08-15322
06/16/2008TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Michelle Ramsey stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 1/27/06, 12/19/07, 2/25/08, 3/31/08. 08-15326
06/26/2008TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Yvette Lester stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 12/26/07. 08-16425
07/02/2008TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 6/21/04. Court Reporter: Gina Shrader. 08-16898
08/25/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Court recorders/reporters Shea, Murrary, and Pichierri: 20 days to file a certificate acknowledging delivery. Fn1 [A copy of the transcript request form is attached to this order.] 08-21816
09/02/2008MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: September 29, 2008. 08-22454
09/03/2008TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Yvette Lester stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: No dates specified. 08-22623
09/24/2008TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 10/11/04 and 11/22/04. Court Reporter: Loree Gallegos. 08-24707
09/25/2008TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Gayle Pichierri stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 03/20/06. 08-24834
10/02/2008MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 08-25519
10/14/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. to file documents and granting motion. Ms. Lunkwitz nor Ms. Shea has filed a certificate of delivery. We note, however, that our August 25, 2008, order was not served on Ms. Lunkwitz, individually, but on the court recorder for Department IX. Ms. Lunkwitz, or the court recorder for department IX, and Ms. Shea: 20 days to prepare the requested transcripts, file them in district court, and deliver them to the requesting party, if they have not already done so, and file, in this court, a certificate acknowledging delivery of the requested transcripts. Opening Brief due 65 days. Fn1 [A copy of the transcript request form is attached to this order.] 08-26461
10/23/2008TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Yvette Lester stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 1/27/06, 5/19/06, 7/17/06, 7/26/06, 8/2/06, 8/16/06, 8/28/06, 8/31/06, 2/2/07, 12/26/07, 12/29/07, 2/25/08, 3/31/08. 08-27245
10/28/2008Other Returned Mail. Order filed 10/14/08 addressed to Court Reporter Elizabeth A. Shea. No forwarding address. 08-27670
12/22/2008MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 08-32377
12/31/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion and Regarding Transcripts. Counsel for appellant shall have 20 days from the date of this order to determine whether notes or recordings of the proceedings are available for transcription, inform this court that the transcripts are unavailable and whether proceedings under NRAP 9(d) are necessary, or inform this court that the transcripts of the proceedings on June 7, 2004, and June 18, 2004, are not necessary to the prosecution of this appeal. Because extreme and unforeseeable circumstances have been shown, we grant the motion for an extension of time. Briefing of this appeal shall be suspended pending further order of this court. 08-33086
01/13/2009Other Returned Mail. Order filed 12/31/08 addressed to Court Reporter Elizabeth A. Shea. No forwarding address. 09-00988
02/17/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Reinstating Briefing. Opening Brief due 45 days. 09-04003
04/03/2009MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 09-08446
04/13/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Opening brief and appendix due: July 2, 2009. No further extensions of time shall be permitted absent demonstration of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. 09-09218
07/02/2009BriefFiled Opening Brief. 09-16403
07/08/2009AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 through 24. 09-16740
08/03/2009MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (30) days. 09-18896
08/03/2009Notice/OutgoingFiled Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief due: September 2, 2009. 09-18897
09/02/2009BriefFiled Answering Brief. 09-21381
10/01/2009MotionFiled Stipulation. Stipulation for 30 days to file reply brief 09-23944
10/01/2009Notice/OutgoingFiled Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Reply Brief due: November 2, 2009. 09-23945
11/03/2009MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for an Extension to File Reply Brief 09-26769
11/06/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. for extension of time. Reply brief due 12/2/09. 09-27238
12/03/2009BriefFiled Reply Brief. 09-29210
04/16/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 10-09966
04/16/2010Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
05/28/2010Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP10-JH/MD/KP 10-13895
06/22/2010RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 10-15727
06/22/2010Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/09/2010RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 30, 2010. 10-15727