Case Information: 51515 | |||
Short Caption: | GORDILLO (ANTONIO) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR071488 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/30/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
04/30/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 08-10760 | |
05/12/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Show Cause. Counsel for appellant shall have 20 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Fast track briefing is suspended. | 08-11728 | |
05/20/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Motion to Enlarge Time to Respond to Order to Show Cause. | 08-12640 | |
06/13/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. Appellant's counsel shall have until June 23, 3008, to file the response to the order to show cause. | 08-15121 | |
06/18/2008 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. | 08-15642 | |
07/21/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP08-JH/RP/MD | 08-18676 | |
08/15/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-19831 | |
08/15/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
09/03/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 27, 2008. | 08-19831 |