Case Information: 55265 | |||
Short Caption: | NIELSEN VS. NEV. STATE BD. OF NURSING | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A570077 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 01/20/2010 / Saint-Aubin, Robert | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/15/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 10-01275 | |
01/15/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. Filing fee will be fowarded by the District Court. | ||
01/19/2010 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Kristina S. Holman check no. 1106. | ||
01/20/2010 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Robert F. Saint-Aubin | 10-01572 | |
02/01/2010 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 10-02716 | |
02/01/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. (Docketing Statement) | 10-02719 | |
02/08/2010 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a conference will be scheduled for mid to late March | 10-03539 | |
02/09/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. - Docketing Statement served on Settlement Judge. | 10-03626 | |
02/12/2010 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to 3/15/10 | 10-03857 | |
03/23/2010 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. A tentative agreement will be reduced to writing and submitted to the Board of Nursing for ratification | 10-07552 | |
05/04/2010 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued. The parties are working on obtaining board approval of a tentative resolution. | 10-11497 | |
06/10/2010 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/Settlement. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter | 10-14965 | |
06/21/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Stipulation or motion to dismiss due: 30 days. | 10-16150 | |
07/06/2010 | Motion | Filed Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice. | 10-17459 | |
07/15/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). CLK- SNP-TH | 10-18223 | |
07/15/2010 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |