judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HIGHTOWER (DENNIS) VS. STATE

Case Information: 51512
Short Caption:HIGHTOWER (DENNIS) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 47077 , 47267 , 51135
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C213649Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:07/07/2008How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/29/2008Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
04/29/2008Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 08-10692
05/15/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 90 days. [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] 08-12220
07/07/2008Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 3. 08-17185
07/07/2008Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
10/21/2009Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP09-MC/NS/MG. 09-25650
11/17/2009RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 09-27694
11/17/2009Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/25/2009RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 20, 2009. 09-27694