Case Information: 51513 | |||
Short Caption: | DANG (KHANG) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 50274 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C227188 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Pickering | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Justice Hardesty for Chief Justice Pickering | Panel Assigned: | Panel |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 07/10/2008 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/30/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
04/30/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 08-10707 | |
05/12/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Transmit Required Document. 5/1/08 Order Denying Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Due Date: 10 days | 08-11795 | |
05/21/2008 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on 05/01/08. Order Denying Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus | 08-12802 | |
06/03/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 90 days. [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] | 08-13970 | |
07/10/2008 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. | 08-17662 | |
07/10/2008 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
11/12/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Order Directing Transmission of Supplemental Record on Appeal. Supplemental Record due: 40 days. | 08-28763 | |
12/08/2008 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Kiara Schmidt stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 10/24/06. | 08-31321 | |
12/08/2008 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 10/24/06. Court Reporter: Kiara Schmidt. | 08-31322 | |
12/18/2008 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. | 08-32119 | |
03/05/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP09-JH/RP/MD | 09-05666 | |
03/05/2009 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Pickering. | ||
03/31/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-06806 | |
03/31/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
04/13/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 3, 2009. | 09-06806 |