Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/29/2008 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP check no. 39535. | | |
04/29/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | | 08-10602 |
04/29/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Documents. It has been determined that this appeal willl not be scheduled for settlement conference. Transcript request form due: 15 days. Opening Brief due: 120 days. | | 08-10669 |
04/30/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Vacating Briefing Schedule, Setting Expedited Briefing Schedule, and Setting Oral Argument. We vacate the April 29, 2008 transcript and briefing schedule notice and issue the following expedited transcript request and briefing schedule in its place. Transcript Request Form due: 5 days. If a transcript is requested, court reporter's certificate of delivery is due: 10 days from service of request. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: May 23, 2008. Respondent's Answering Brief due: June 13, 2008. Appellant's Reply Brief (if any) due: June 20, 2008. Service of all documents shall be personal or by facsimile transmission. No extensions of time will be granted. We direct the clerk to schedule this matter for oral argument before the full court on Tuesday, July 1, 2008. Once scheduled, the parties will be notified with the exact time for the oral argument. fn3[We suspend the provisions of NRAP 25(1)(a), which state that a document is timely filed if, on or before its due date, it is mailed to this court or dispatched for delivery within three calendar days by a third-party commercial carrier or deposited in the supreme court drop box.] All documents shall be filed personally or by facsimile transmission with the clerk in Carson City.] | | 08-10721 |
05/05/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 4/18/08. Court Reporter: Sunshine Reporting Services, Court Reporter, Department 2. (filed via fax). | | 08-11123 |
05/06/2008 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. Via fax. | | 08-11286 |
05/07/2008 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Hale Lane Peek Dennison & Howard--check no. 082374. | | |
05/07/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Cross-Appeal. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for cross-appellant.) | | 08-11399 |
05/08/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. Respondents/Cross-Appellants. | | 08-11457 |
05/08/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Setting Expedited Briefing Schedule for Cross-Appeal. Cross-appellant's answering/opening brief due: June 13, 2008 and cross-respondent's reply/answering brief due: June 20, 2008, the deadlines set in our April 30, 2008 order. Respondents/Cross-Appellants shall file a reply brief on cross-appeal, if any, no later than June 25, 2008. The provisions of our April 30, 2008 order requiring filing and service only by personal delivery or facsimile remain in force. | | 08-11500 |
05/09/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Consolidating Appeals and Cross-Appeal, Setting Expedited Briefing Schedule, and Setting Oral Argument. We consolidate Docket Nos. 51509 and 51564 for all appellate purposes. Finally, respondents/cross-appellants shall file reply briefs on cross-appeal, if any, no later than June 25, 2008. The provisions of our April 30 order, requiring filing and service only by personal delivery or facsimile and prohibiting any extensions of time for this briefing schedule, remain in force. Our April 30 order set oral argument in Docket No. 51509 before the full court on Tuesday, July 1, 2008. We hereby modify that order and direct the clerk of this court to set these consolidated appeals and cross-appeal for oral argument before the full court on that date. Once scheduled, the parties will be notified with the exact time for the argument. Fn4 [Specifically, for these consolidated appeals and cross-appeal, service of documents shall be personal or by facsimile transmission. Likewise, we suspend the provisions of NRAP 25(1)(a), which state that a document is timely filed if, on or before its due date, it is mailed to this court or dispatched for delivery within three calendar days by a third-party commercial carrier or deposited in the supreme court drop box. See NRAP 2. Accordingly, all documents shall be filed personally or by facsimile transmission with the clerk of this court in Carson City.] Nos. 51509/51564. | | 08-11678 |
05/19/2008 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. Nos. 51509/51564. | | 08-12522 |
05/23/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Las Vegas Convention and Visitors Authority. Vols. 1 and 2. Nos. 51509/51564. | | 08-12997 |
05/23/2008 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. (Filed via fax). Nos. 51509/51564. | | 08-13141 |
05/23/2008 | Brief | Filed Joinder to Brief. (Filed via fax). Appellants in 51564, County of Clark, City of Boulder City, City of Henderson, City of Las Vegas, City of Mesquite, City of North Las Vegas Joinder in Appellant/Cross-Respondent Las Vegas Convention and Visitors Authority's Opening Brief. Nos. 51509/51564. | | 08-13145 |
05/27/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 60 minutes in Carson City on July 1, 2008 at 10:00 a.m. (En Banc) Nos. 51509/51564. | | 08-13229 |
05/27/2008 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. Appellant/Cross-Respondent Las Vegas Convention and Visitors Authority. (Original). Nos. 51509/51564 (08-13251). | | 08-13251 |
05/27/2008 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Cindy Lee Brown stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 4/18/08. Nos. 51509/51564 (08-13257). | | 08-13257 |
06/04/2008 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Parraguirre. | | |
06/04/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Justice Disqualification. Justice Parraguirre (voluntary recusal). | | 08-14117 |
06/04/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Setting Prehearing Conference. Pursuant to Nevada Rule of Appellate Procedure 33, the parties are directed to appear before the full court on a stacked calendar at 1:30 p.m., on Friday, June 13, 2008, at the Supreme Court, Regional Justice Center, Las Vegas, for a prehearing conference. We further order the parties to file by 5:00 p.m. on June 12, 2008, an affidavit or declaration under oath from a state or county elected official specifying all time lines required for the preparation, printing, and circulation of ballots for both the primary and general elections. | | 08-14141 |
06/05/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Amended Order Setting Prehearing Conference. Fn1 [This order corrects a clerical error on page 3 of the order filed June 4, 2008.] Nos. 51509/51564. | | 08-14179 |
06/10/2008 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter. from David Kihara at the Las Vegas Review Journal requesting cameras in the courtroom. Nos. 50895/51509 cw 51564/51538/51539/51639/51735/51768/51798/51802. | | |
06/10/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. . Permission is granted for photographic and electronic media coverage of the aforesaid matter, for news purposes and not for commerical exploitation. David Kihara of the Las Vegas Review- Journal is designated as still photography pool coordinator and Robert Martinez of KLAS - TV is designated as video and audio pool coordinator for purposes of organizing and coordinating the orderly coverage of such proceedings by all participants. All equipment necessary to allow for such photographic or electronic coverage of such proceedings shall be placed in the courtroom before 10:00 a.m. and on June 13, 2008. Nos. 50895/51509/51564/51538/51539/51639/51735/51768/51798/51802. | | |
06/10/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Submittal of Affidavit of Harvard L. Lomax in Response to Order Setting Prehearing Conference. (Filed via fax.) Nos. 51509/51564. | | 08-14695 |
06/12/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Affidavit. Respondents/Cross-Appellants School Funding Solutions Ballot; School Road and Safety; and Seale Request for Notice of Filing and for Judicial Notice on Appeal. Nos. 51509/51564. | | 08-15049 |
06/13/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Affidavit. Submittal of Affidavit of Ross Miller Pursuant to Order Setting Prehearing Conference. Nos. 51509/51564. | | 08-15059 |
06/13/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Secretary of State's Notice in Lieu of Answering Brief. Nos. 51509/51564. | | 08-15076 |
06/13/2008 | Other | Other. Prehearing Conference held this day before the En Banc Court. | | |
06/13/2008 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. Respondent/Cross-Appellant. Nos. 51509/51564. | | 08-15179 |
06/13/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief. Respondent/Cross-Appellant. Nos. 51509/51564. | | 08-15180 |
06/13/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. we vacate the oral argument currently scheduled for July 1, 2008. The briefing schedule set forth in our Mary 16, 2008 order shall nevertheless proceed. The parties are directed to notify this court immediately upon the district court's ruling. Nos. 51509/51564 | | 08-15190 |
06/19/2008 | Brief | Filed Joinder to Brief. Joinder to Appellant/Cross-Respondent Las Vegas Convention and Visitors Authority's Reply Brief and Answering Brief on Cross-Appeal. (Filed via fax). Nos. 51509/51564. | | 08-15781 |
06/23/2008 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. Appellant/Cross-Respondent. Reply Brief of Appellant Las Vegas Convention and Visitors Authority. Nos. 51509/51564. (Filed via fax). | | 08-15950 |
06/25/2008 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief on Cross-Appeal. Respondent/Cross-Appellant School Funding Solutions, et al. Nos. 51509/51564. | | 08-16226 |
06/25/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Errata. LVCVA Notice of Errata and Correction of Brief. Nos. 51509/51564. (Filed via fax). | | 08-16265 |
06/25/2008 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. (Corrected) Answering/Reply Brief of Appellant of Las Vegas Convention and Visitors Authority. Nos. 51509/51564. (Filed via fax). | | 08-16266 |
06/26/2008 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. ORIGINAL-Appellant/Cross-Respondent. Reply Brief of Appellant Las Vegas Convention and Visitors Authority. Nos. 51509/51564. (Filed via fax on 06/23/08). | | 08-16392 |
06/30/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Errata. ORIGINAL-LVCVA Notice of Errata and Correction of Brief. Nos. 51509/51564. (Filed via fax 06/25/08). | | 08-16676 |
06/30/2008 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. ORIGINAL-(Corrected) Answering/Reply Brief of Appellant of Las Vegas Convention and Visitors Authority. Nos. 51509/51564. (Filed via fax 06/25/08). | | 08-16687 |
07/03/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Notice of District Court's Ruling. Nos. 51509/51564. (Filed via fax). | | 08-17034 |
07/10/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. ORIGINAL - Notice of District Court's Ruling. Nos. 51509/51564. (Filed via fax on 07/03/08). | | 08-17632 |
07/15/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Notice of District Court's Order. Nos. 51509/51564. (Filed via fax). | | 08-18188 |
07/16/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting in Part Motion for Expedited Consideration and Setting Expedited Briefing Schedule. We hereby consolidate the above-captioned cases. We agree that expedited consideration of Docket No. 52045 is required, and so we grant appellants' motion in part. Appellants Opening Briefs and Appendix due: Wed., July 23, 3008, by 4 p.m.; Respondents Answering Briefs due: Wed., Jully 30, 2008, by 4p.m.; Appellants Reply Briefs due (if any) Fri., August 1, 2008, by 4 p.m.. No extensios of this briefing shcedule shall be granted. We direct the clerk of this court to schedule these consolidated appeals for oral argument at 10 a.m. on Wed., August 20, 2008, in Carson City. Fn1[We direct the clerk of this court to amend the caption for Docket No. 52045 on this court's docket to conform with the caption on this order.] fn2[In light of the strict time constraints applicable to this case, we have considered this procedural motion without waiting for an opposition from respondents.] fn4[Service of documents shall be personal or by facsimile transmission only; service by mail is not permitted. All documents shall be filed personally or by facsimile transmission with the clerk of this court in Carson City.] Nos. 51509/51564/51639/52045. | | 08-18250 |
07/16/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 07/02/08. To Court Reporter: Julietta Forbes. Nos. 51509/51564/51639/52045. | | 08-18317 |
07/17/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Notice of Deadlines Pertinent to Consolidated Appeals. Nos. 51509/51564/51639/52045 | | 08-18474 |
07/18/2008 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Julietta Forbes stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 7/2/08. Nos. 51509/51564/51639/52045. | | 08-18496 |
07/18/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. ORIGINAL - Notice of District Court's Order. Nos. 51509/51564. (Filed via fax on 07/15/08). | | 08-18536 |
07/18/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Declining to Modify Briefing Schedule and Oral Argument. Nos. 51509/51564/51639/52045. | | 08-18622 |
07/21/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion for Excess Pages. Appellant's Motion for Pemission to Exceed Page Length Limitation in 52045. Nos. 51509/51564/51639/52045. | | 08-18809 |
07/22/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. appellants in Docket No. 52045 have moved for permission to file an opening brief in excess of 30 pages. Cause appearing, we grant the motion. Appellants shall file and serve an opening brief of no more than 45 pages by July 23, 2008. Nos. 51509/51564/51639/52045 [08-18843] | | 08-18843 |
07/22/2008 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. Appellant's in 52045. Nos. 51509/51564/51639/52045. | | 08-18915 |
07/23/2008 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. (Appellants in 52045). Nos. 51509/51564/51639/52045 (08-19040). | | 08-19040 |
07/23/2008 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vols. 1 through 6. Nos. 51509/51564/51639/52045 (08-19041). | | 08-19041 |
07/23/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae American Civil Liberties Union of Nevada. Nos. 51509/51565/51639/52045. | | 08-19052 |
07/30/2008 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. Answering Brief of Intervenor Nevadans for Nevada in 52045. Nos. 51509/51564/51639/52045. (Filed via fax). | | 08-19607 |
07/30/2008 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. Intervenor Las Vegas Convention and Visitors Authority's Answering Brief in 52045. Nos. 51509/51564/51639/52045. (Filed via fax). | | 08-19750 |
07/30/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion and Order/Excess Pages. Granted: 43 pages. Nevada State Ed. Assoc. in 52045. Nos. 51509/51564/51639/52045. | | 08-19761 |
07/30/2008 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. Respondent Nevada State Education Association's Answering Brief in 52045. Nos. 51509/51564/51639/52045. | | 08-19762 |
07/30/2008 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. Secretary of State. Nos. 51509/51564/51639/52045. | | 08-19763 |
08/01/2008 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. Intervenor Las Vegas Convention and Visitors Authority in 52045. Nos. 51509/51564/51639/52045 (08-20031). (Original). | | 08-20031 |
08/01/2008 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. Nevadans for Fair Taxes School Funding Solutions Ballot Advocacy Group and School, Road, and Safety Funding Solutions Ballot Advocacy Group. Appellants in 52045. Nos. 51509/51564/51639/52045 (08-20049). | | 08-20049 |
08/05/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 60 minutes in Carson City on August 20, 2008 at 10:00 a.m. (En Banc) Nos. 51509/51564/51639/52045. | | 08-20219 |
08/11/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. Nos. 51509/51564/51639/52045. | | 08-20644 |
08/11/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. of Assignment. The Honorable Robert E. Rose, Senior Justice, is assigned to participate in the determination of this matter in the place of Justice Parraguirre and to hear the oral argument scheduled for August 20, 2008, at 10:00 a.m. Nos. 51509/51564/51639/52045. | | 08-20744 |
08/14/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motions for Judicial Notice and for Leave to File an Amicus Brief. We grant appellants' motion for judicial notice. We grant the Nevada ACLU's unopposed motion for leave to file an amicus brief in the consolidated appeals. The clerk of this court shall file the proposed amicus brief, provisionally received by this court on July 23, 2008. fn1[We grant appellants' June 20, 2008, motion for leave to file a reply, and we direct the clerk of this court to file the reply, provisionally received by this court on June 20, 2008.] Nos. 51509/51564/51639/52045. | | 08-21029 |
08/14/2008 | Brief | Filed Amicus Brief. Brief of Amicus Curiae American Civil Liberties Union of Nevada. Nos. 51509/51564/51639/52045. | | 08-19054 |
08/14/2008 | Motion | Filed Reply to Response. Reply to Opposition to Request for Judicial Notice on Appeal. Nos. 51509/51564/51639/52045 (08-15913). | | |
08/15/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. The Las Vegas Convention and Visitors Authority's Notice of Recent Case Authority. Nos. 51509/51564/51639/52045. (Filed via fax). | | 08-21158 |
08/18/2008 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter. from Ed Vogel of the Las Vegas Review-Journal requesting cameras in the courtroom on Wednesday, August 10, 2008 at 10:00 a.m. Nos. 51509/51564/51639/52045. | | 08-21257 |
08/18/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. ORIGINAL - The Las Vegas Convention and Visitors Authority's Notice of Recent Case Authority. Nos. 51509/51564/51639/52045. (Filed via fax on 08/15/08). | | 08-21309 |
08/18/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Appellants' Response to Las Vegas Convention and Visitors' Authority's Notice of Recent Case Authority and Request for Judicial Notice. Nos. 51509/51564/51639/52045. | | 08-21327 |
08/19/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Permission is granted for photographic or electronic media coverage of the hearing on August 20, 2008. Ed Vogel of the Las Vegas Review-Journal is designated as pool coordinator. Nos. 51509/51564/51639/52045. [08-21343] | | 08-21343 |
08/19/2008 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. The Las Vegas Convention and Visitors Authority's Objection to Petitioner's Request for Judicial Notice. Nos. 51509/51564/51639/52045. Filed via fax. | | 08-21388 |
08/19/2008 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. The Secretary's Response in Opposition to Request for Judicial Notice. Nos. 51509/51564/51639/52045. (Filed via fax). | | 08-21408 |
08/20/2008 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | | |
08/25/2008 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. ORIGINAL - The Las Vegas Convention and Visitors Authority's Objection to Petitioner's Request for Judicial Notice. (filed via fax on 08/19/08). Nos. 51509/51564/51639/52045 | | 08-21918 |
09/04/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Allowing Notice of Supplemental Authority and Denying Request for Judicial Notice. fn1[The Honorable Robert Rose, Senior Justice, was appointed by the court to sit in place of the Honorable Ron Parraguirre, Justice. Nev. Const. art. 6, 19; SCR 10.] Nos. 51509/51564/51639/52045. | | 08-22705 |
09/04/2008 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Per Curiam Opinion. "Affirmed in Part and Dismissed in Part." Fn1 [The Honorable Robert Rose, Senior Justice, was appointed by the court to sit in place of the Honorable Ron Parraguirre, Justice.]Before the Court EN BANC. Author: Per Curiam. Majority: Gibbons/Maupin/Hardesty/Douglas/Cherry/Saitta/Rose. 124 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 62.. EN BANC. Nos. 51509/51564/51639/52045. | | 08-22729 |
09/30/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | | 08-23456 |
09/30/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | | |
10/08/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 1, 2008. | | 08-23456 |
12/15/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Letter. to Publishers re: corrections in recently filed opinions. Nos. 51509/51564/51639/52045 | | 08-31856 |