Case Information: 51503 | |||
Short Caption: | AUSIELLO (MARIAN) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 48244 , 50729 , 55991 , 57450 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Nye Co. - Fifth Judicial District - CR4853 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/28/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
04/28/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 08-10540 | |
06/06/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Appellant's Motion for Enlargement of Time Within Which to File Appellant's Fast Track Statement. | 08-14363 | |
06/20/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion for Excess Pages. Appellant's Motion for Leave to File Appellant's Fast Track Statement in Excess of Ten Pages. | 08-15855 | |
06/24/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motions. The clerk shall file the fast track statement and appendix received on June 20, 2008. | 08-16082 | |
06/24/2008 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 08-15856 | |
06/24/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 08-15857 | |
07/11/2008 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Response due: July 21, 2008. | 08-17818 | |
07/23/2008 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 08-18998 | |
07/23/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Response. | 08-18999 | |
07/28/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Strike. Appellant's Motion to Strike Documentation and References to Documentation Not In Record. | 08-19331 | |
08/11/2008 | Motion | Filed Stipulation. Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Appellant's Motion to Strike Documentation. | 08-20665 | |
08/19/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Stipulation Approved. On August 11, 2008, the parties filed a stipulation for an extension of time to allow respondent to file a response to the motion to strike. The stipulation is approved. The clerk of this court shall file the motion to strike and opposition received on August 18, 2008. | 08-21350 | |
08/19/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion to Strike Lines 17-18 of Page 5 of Appellant's Fast Track Statement and Opposition to Appellant's Motion to Strike. | 08-21245 | |
09/09/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Appellant's Motion to Strike and Denying Respondent's Motion to Strike. The clerk of this court shall strike the documents in respondent's appendix identified as (1) "E-Mail from Sgt. Travis Huggins to Chief Deputy District Attorney Kirk Vitto Dated Friday (sic) July 21, 2006," (2) "Unfiled Motion to Withdraw Guilty Plea," (3) "Affidavit of Detective John Powell," and (4) "Letter from Appellant to District Attorney's Office Received on June 12, 2008," and the references to those documents contained on page 2, lines 13-25; page 8, lines 16-28; and page 9, lines 1-15 of the fast track response. | 08-23189 | |
04/15/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the amended judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP09-RP/MD/KP | 09-09448 | |
05/12/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-10570 | |
05/12/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
05/20/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 14, 2009. | 09-10570 |