judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

IN RE: MICHELLE HAMILTON DAVY

Case Information: 10-BG-1162
Short Caption:IN RE: MICHELLE HAMILTON DAVYClassification:Bar Governance - Bar - Disciplinary Reciprocal
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:BDN274-10Filed Date:09/17/2010

Opening Event Date:09/17/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/21/2011
Argued/Submitted:03/30/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/12/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerBar CounselN
Wallace E. Shipp NN
William R. RossNY
PetitionerBoard on Professional ResponsibilityN
Charles J. WilloughbyNN
RespondentMichelle Hamilton Davy NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
09/17/2010DISCIPLINARY LETTER from the Office of Bar Counsel with a certified copy of an order of the Court of Appeals of Maryland indefinitely suspending respondent by consent. Also, certified copies of orders imposing reciprocal discipline in the US District Court for the District of Columbia and the US District Court for the District of Maryland (informational purposes only).
09/28/2010APPEARANCE of Justin M. Flint, Esquire and Aaron L. L. Handleman as attorneys for Respondent.
09/28/2010RESPONDENT'S OPPOSITION to Bar Counsel's motion for an order of an indefinite suspension of her District of Columbia law license.
09/28/2010RECEIVED from respondent Rule 28 (A)(2) certificate.
10/04/2010PETITIONER'S REPLY to respondent's opposition to Bar Counsel's order for interim suspension.
11/09/2010TMC - notice to the court & request for susupension and SHOW CAUSE - response by Davy - response by Bar Counsel - proposed published order
12/01/2010ORDER On consideration of the certified copy of Attorney Grievance Com'n of Maryland v. Hamilton (aka Davy), 832 A.2d 170 (MD 2003), wherein the State of Maryland indefinitely suspended respondent's license to practice law by consent, respondent's opposition to Bar Counsel's proposed order and the reply of Bar Counsel, it is ORDERED that respondent shall, within 30 days from the date of this order, show cause why reciprocal discipline should not be imposed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Bar Counsel shall reply to respondent's response no later than fifteen days after service of the response or the time for respondent to respond, whichever is earlier. Bar Counsel may object to the imposition of reciprocal discipline based upon the facts set forth in D.C. Bar R. XI, Sec 11 (c). Bar Counsel shall provide the Court with the relevant portions of the record and proceedings in the other disciplining court, the statute and rules that governed it, and a short statement identifying all of the issues that the matter presents. It is FURTHER ORDERED that if Bar Counsel opposes the imposition of identical discipline, Bar Counsel shall (1) recommend appropriate discipline or (2) request that the matter be referred to the Board for its recommendation on discipline. Respondent may, within 10 days after service of Bar Counsel's submission, file a reply. (RD,BR,NW)
12/14/2010COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS (Respondent) (Consent)
12/16/2010ORDER On consideration of the consent motion to withdraw appearance of Counsels for respondent, Michell Hamilton Davy, Esquire, and it appearing that respondent's response to the court's December 2, 1010 show cause order is due January 3, 2011, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and Justin M. Flint, Esquire and Aaron L. Handleman, Esquire, are hereby withdrawn as Counsels for respondent. It is FURTHER ORDERED that respondent's response to the court's December 1, 2010, show cause order is due January 3, 2011. (JC)
01/03/2011RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Respondent)
01/20/2011STATEMENT of Bar Counsel regarding reciprocal discipline.
01/21/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
01/21/2011FINAL SCREENING - SUMMARY CALENDAR I
02/02/2011CALENDAR NOTICE SENT
02/03/2011RECEIVED respondent's opposition to statement regarding reciprocal discipline
03/30/2011FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/30/2011SUBMITTED to Judges Blackburne-Rigsby, Oberly, Steadman
07/21/2011FiledSuspended ORDERED that Michelle Hamilton Davy is hereby suspended from the practice of law in the District of Columbia for the period of one year, beginning from the future date on which she files an affidavit compliant with D.C. Bar R. XI, Sec 14 (g). Reinstatement in the District of Columbia is conditioned upon demonstration of fitness to practice law in accordance with D.C. Bar R. XI, Sec 3 (a)(2). (BR,OB,ST)
08/04/2011LodgedLetter From Bar Counsel advising the court that respondent has failed to file the required affidavit in compliance with D.C. Bar R. XI, Sec 14. (Petitioner Bar Counsel)
08/12/2011FiledMandate