Case Information: 31628 | |||
Short Caption: | IMAN (WILLIAM) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C126063 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 03/05/1999 | How Submitted: | |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/05/1998 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
01/05/1998 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | ||
02/06/1998 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice. Issued Notice to Transmit Required Document (Orders filed 12/10/97 and 12/23/97) to Clark County Clerk. Due date: 10 days. | ||
02/13/1998 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Received Documents from District Court Clerk. Filed certified copy of district court orders filed in the district court on 12/10/97 and 12/23/97. | ||
11/10/1998 | Order/Procedural | Filed Case Processing Order. Re: Records on Appeal. Within 120 days from the date of this order, the clerk of the district court shall transmit to the clerk of this court a certified copy of the complete trial court record in each of the above-identified appeals, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings. 1[The records shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 31628, 31831, 33072, 33104, 33121, 33139, 33210, 33227. | ||
03/05/1999 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal. Vols. 1 and 2 (copies). Mailed on: 3/3/99. | ||
03/05/1999 | Other | Other. Case submitted on the record this day. | ||
03/05/1999 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
01/11/2001 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. " . . . we affirm the order of the district court." NNP00A-MS/DA/ML | 01-00686 | |
02/06/2001 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 01-00764 | |
02/06/2001 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
03/08/2001 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 13, 2001. | 01-00764 |