Case Information: 51498 | |||
Short Caption: | MILSNER VS. DIST. CT. (CARSTARPHEN) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 51631 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0301402 | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/25/2008 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Richard G. Hill, Chartered--check no. 2486. | ||
04/25/2008 | Petition/Writ | Filed Petition for Writ. Petition for Emergency Temporary Writ of Prohibition and Writ of Mandamus. | 08-10377 | |
04/25/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ. | 08-10378 | |
04/25/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Procedural Deficiency. Affidavit. Due Date: 10 days | 08-10396 | |
04/28/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Denying Petition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." SNP08-RP/JH/MC. | 08-10546 | |
04/28/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Affidavit. Declaration of Counsel. | 08-10561 | |
05/02/2008 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on April 28, 2008. (Motion to Dismiss.) | 08-11004 | |
05/23/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 08-11743 | |
05/23/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. |