Case Information: 55276 | |||
Short Caption: | JEFFERSON (WILLIE) VS. WARDEN | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | White Pine Co. - Seventh Judicial District - HC0903008 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 03/08/2010 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/15/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 10-01370 | |
01/15/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
01/15/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. Representing respondent: Michael Bongard (Attorney General/Ely). | 10-01381 | |
01/26/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 90 days. | 10-02202 | |
03/08/2010 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Exhibit 6 attached. | 10-06030 | |
03/08/2010 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
05/07/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP10-JH/MD/KP | 10-11857 | |
06/01/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-12643 | |
06/01/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
06/08/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 3, 2010. | 10-12643 |