Case Information: 55266 | |||
Short Caption: | CRUTCHER (BYRON) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 32140 , 38451 , 41708 , 42355 , 43791 , 44569 , 46767 , 49165 , 49347 , 51930 , 54062 , 55187 , 57252 , 57658 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - 96C136562 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Saitta | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 04/07/2010 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/15/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 10-01279 | |
01/15/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
01/15/2010 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Saitta. Sat in district court proceedings. | ||
01/26/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 30 days. | 10-02198 | |
02/19/2010 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on February 6, 2010. Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order. | 10-04567 | |
03/16/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Re: Record on Appeal. Upon issuance of the remittitur in Docket No. 54062, this court directs the clerk of this court to transfer the record on appeal previously filed in Docket No. 54062 to Docket No. 55266. Supplemental Record on Appeal Docket No. 55266 due: 30 days. | ||
04/07/2010 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vol. 7 | 10-08943 | |
04/07/2010 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 6. (TRANSFERRED FROM CASE 54062 PER ORDER FILED 3/16/10) | 10-09059 | |
04/07/2010 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
05/07/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP10-JH/MD/KP | 10-11863 | |
06/01/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-12647 | |
06/01/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
06/14/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 4, 2010. | 10-12647 |