Case Information: 51519 | |||
Short Caption: | WILLIAMS (RONALD) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 45904 , 45991 , 49648 , 50144 , 55368 , 55567 , 59093 , 59389 , 72099 , 73712 , 73712-COA | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C197042 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 07/08/2008 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/01/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
05/01/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 08-10897 | |
05/15/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Re: Record on Appeal. Upon issuance of the remitittur in Docket No. 49648, this court directs the clerk of this court to transfer the record on appeal previously filed in Docket No. 49648 to Docket No. 51519. Supplemental Record on Apeal due: 30 days. | 08-12244 | |
06/02/2008 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vol. 5 | 08-13874 | |
07/08/2008 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 5. (TRANSFERRED FROM 49648 PER ORDER FILED 05/15/08.) | 08-17357 | |
07/08/2008 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
09/15/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP08-JH/RP/MD. | 08-23698 | |
10/10/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-24739 | |
10/10/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
10/22/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 14, 2008. | 08-24739 |