judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SUMMERS (CHARLES) VS. STATE

Case Information: 51520
Short Caption:SUMMERS (CHARLES) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 45683 , 48796 , 59470
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C198299Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:07/03/2008How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/01/2008Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
05/01/2008Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 08-10903
05/15/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 90 days. [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] 08-12251
07/03/2008Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1-9. 08-17055
07/03/2008Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
08/25/2009Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP09-MC/NS/MG fn2[We have reviewed all documents that appellant has submitted in proper person to the clerk of this court in this matter, and we conclude that no relief based upon those submissions is warranted.] 09-20687
09/22/2009RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 09-21150
09/22/2009Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/26/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. this court denies the [October 6, 2009] petition. The court directs that the clerk of this court not accept any further proper person documents in this matter. 09-26052
02/11/2010RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 4, 2010. 09-21150