Case Information: 51526 | |||
Short Caption: | OMEGA WEST CO. VS. STATE, DEP'T OF EMPLOYMENT, TRAINING & REHAB. | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A557195 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 05/05/2008 / Berkson, Lester | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/01/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | ||
05/01/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 08-10919 | |
05/01/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days | 08-10922 | |
05/01/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days | 08-10924 | |
05/05/2008 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lester H. Berkson | 08-11068 | |
05/06/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Case Appeal Statement. | 08-11293 | |
07/02/2008 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued after the original conference date of 7/8/08 was cancelled to allow parties to attempt to settle. | 08-16846 | |
07/02/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. appellant shall, within 15 days from the date of this order, pay the sum of $500.00 to the Supreme Court Law Library and provide this court with proof of such payment. However, this sanction shall be automatically vacated if appellant pays the filing fee and files and serves the docketing statement or, alternatively, a motion to extend time, within ten days from the date of this order. | 08-16879 | |
07/14/2008 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. First Amended Docketing Statement Civil Appeals (Now Has Exhibits Attached). | 08-17963 | |
07/14/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. Docketing Statement. | 08-17964 | |
07/14/2008 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 08-17993 | |
07/14/2008 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Donn M. Ianuzi - money order 0885608904. | ||
07/14/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 10 days. First Amended Docketing Statement. | 08-17998 | |
07/22/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. Docketing Statement on Settlement Judge. | 08-18837 | |
07/22/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. First Amended Docketing Statement (Including Exhibits) on Settlement Judge. | 08-18838 | |
07/22/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Notice of change of address for J. Thomas Susich, Esq. | 08-18908 | |
11/05/2008 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 08-28284 | |
12/19/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Regarding Conclusion of Settlement Proceedings and to Show Cause. Briefing and compliance with NRAP 3(e) shall remain suspended. Appellant's response due: 15 days. Respondent may file any reply within ten days from the date that appellant's response is served. | 08-32284 | |
12/31/2008 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. Appellant's Response to Supreme Court's Order to Provide Authority for the Notice of Appeal. | 08-33021 | |
01/08/2009 | Motion | Filed Reply to Response to Order to Show Cause. Respondent ESD's Reply to Appellant's Argument Concerning Timeliness of Appeal. | 09-00499 | |
01/22/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "this appeal is dismissed." NNP08G-MC/MG/NS. | 09-01783 | |
02/17/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-02208 | |
02/17/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
02/27/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 23, 2009. | 09-02208 |