Case Information: 51527 | |||
Short Caption: | WARM SPRINGS CHECK VS. CITY OF HENDERSON | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A526080 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Parraguirre | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 05/05/2008 / Berkson, Lester | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/01/2008 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from David Winterton & Associates check no. 6879. | ||
05/01/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 08-10936 | |
05/02/2008 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Parraguirre. (Harrison, Kemp, Jones & Coulthard.) | ||
05/05/2008 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lester H. Berkson | 08-11069 | |
05/30/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement. | 08-13629 | |
06/05/2008 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 08-14236 | |
06/05/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. -Docketing Statement. | 08-14237 | |
06/18/2008 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/Settlement. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. | 08-15568 | |
06/18/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. -docketing statement served on settlement judge. | 08-15652 | |
06/26/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Stipulation or motion to dismiss due: 30 days. [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] | 08-16374 | |
07/11/2008 | Motion | Filed Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Pursuant to Settlement Conference. | 08-17780 | |
07/16/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). CLK-TH [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] | 08-18213 | |
07/16/2008 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |