judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-5919
A-5919
06/22/1956
Application for Writ of Error
ALFODO SERNA, ET AL.
STATE AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE ASSOCIATION, M. T. COCHRUM, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/14/1956Motion for RehearingPetitioner
09/06/1956Response to PetitionRespondent
06/22/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/14/1956Motion for RehearingOverruled
11/02/1956Exhibits withdrawn. See Remarks
09/06/1956Response to Petition
06/30/1956Motion for Extension of Time to File Response
06/22/1956Application for Writ of Error - Filed
06/22/1956Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Alfodo Serna, et al.Petitioner
M. T. Cochrum, et al.Respondent
State Automobile Insurance AssociationRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information