Case: 13-23-00365-CR
13-23-00365-CR
08/15/2023
Delivery of a Controlled Substance
Laura Ann Perez
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
01/16/2024 | Amended brief received | State | | ||||
01/16/2024 | Amended brief filed | State |
| ||||
12/15/2023 | Brief received - oral argument not requested | State |
| ||||
11/20/2023 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellant |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/07/2024 | Oral argument denied |
| |||||
01/25/2024 | Motion to consolidate disposed | Grant motion |
| ||||
01/16/2024 | Amended brief filed |
| |||||
01/16/2024 | Motion to consolidate filed |
| |||||
01/16/2024 | Amended brief received | | |||||
01/02/2024 | Motion for extension disposed | Grant motion |
| ||||
12/19/2023 | Motion for extension filed |
| |||||
12/15/2023 | Brief received - oral argument not requested |
| |||||
11/20/2023 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
11/20/2023 | Brief filed - oral argument requested |
| |||||
11/13/2023 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||
10/24/2023 | Letter filed | | |||||
10/18/2023 | Exhibits filed | | |||||
10/18/2023 | Reporters record filed | | |||||
10/18/2023 | No reporters record filed in criminal case |
| |||||
10/18/2023 | Corrected document requested | | |||||
09/18/2023 | Docketing statement filed | | |||||
09/15/2023 | Extension of time to file reporters record disposed | Grant motion |
| ||||
09/15/2023 | Extension of time to file reporters record filed | | |||||
09/14/2023 | Response filed |
| |||||
09/06/2023 | No payment arrangements made with court reporter for record |
| |||||
09/06/2023 | Extension of time to file reporters record filed | | |||||
09/06/2023 | Clerks record filed |
| |||||
09/06/2023 | No reporters record filed in criminal case |
| |||||
09/06/2023 | Corrected document requested | | |||||
09/06/2023 | Corrected document requested | | |||||
09/05/2023 | Corrected document requested | | |||||
08/15/2023 | Document filed | | |||||
08/15/2023 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
| |||||
08/15/2023 | Trial court certification filed | | |||||
08/03/2023 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
07/07/2023 | Sentence imposed in the trial court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
11/20/2023 | At Issue | At issue |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Hon. Paul Watkins |
Perez, Laura Ann | Criminal - Appellant | Hon. John Lamerson |
Trial Court Information
25th District Court
Gonzales
Honorable William D. Old
13-20-B
D'Lois Jones
2 yrs TDCJ - state jail