Case: 14-23-00586-CV
14-23-00586-CV
08/15/2023
Contract
BP America Production Company
Simcoe LLC
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
02/26/2024 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellee |
| ||||
11/03/2023 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellant |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/05/2024 | Motion for extension of time to file reply brief disposed | GRANTED |
| ||||
03/05/2024 | Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed |
| |||||
02/26/2024 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
02/26/2024 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested |
| |||||
02/26/2024 | Appellees brief due | | |||||
01/26/2024 | Appellees brief due | | |||||
01/25/2024 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | GRANTED |
| ||||
01/18/2024 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
01/02/2024 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | GRANTED |
| ||||
12/28/2023 | Notice of late brief |
| |||||
12/27/2023 | Appellees brief due | | |||||
12/19/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
11/27/2023 | Appellees brief due | | |||||
11/15/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | GRANTED |
| ||||
11/14/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
11/03/2023 | Brief filed - oral argument requested |
| |||||
11/03/2023 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
10/26/2023 | Supplemental reporters record filed |
| |||||
10/04/2023 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
09/20/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | GRANTED |
| ||||
09/20/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
09/14/2023 | Reporters record filed |
| |||||
09/13/2023 | Reporters record due | | |||||
09/12/2023 | Extension of time to file reporters record disposed | GRANTED |
| ||||
09/12/2023 | Extension of time to file reporters record filed |
| |||||
09/12/2023 | Reporters record due | | |||||
09/11/2023 | Response due | | |||||
08/30/2023 | Docketing statement filed | | |||||
08/30/2023 | Mediation docketing statement returned |
| |||||
08/30/2023 | Clerks record filed |
| |||||
08/30/2023 | Docketing statement due | | |||||
08/29/2023 | Document returned |
| |||||
08/28/2023 | Notice of late record |
| |||||
08/25/2023 | No payment arrangements made with trial court clerk for record |
| |||||
08/25/2023 | Court fee due | | |||||
08/24/2023 | Record due | | |||||
08/16/2023 | Fee paid |
| |||||
08/15/2023 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||
08/15/2023 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||
08/15/2023 | Case began in court of appeals |
| |||||
08/14/2023 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
08/04/2023 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
02/26/2024 | At Issue | At issue |
04/17/2024 | Status | Reply brief due |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
BP America Production Company | Appellant | Garland Murphy IV Richard Houghton |
Simcoe LLC | Appellee | James Zucker Bryce Callahan Heriberto Montalvo Grant Martinez |
Trial Court Information
55th District Court
Harris
Honorable Judge, 55th District Court
2022-02516
Court Reporter, 55th District Court