judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Bryce Carpenter v. Daspit Law Firm, PLLC

Case: 01-22-00282-CV
01-22-00282-CV
04/14/2022
Contract
Bryce Carpenter
Daspit Law Firm, PLLC
No
www.txcourts.gov/1stcoa
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Document
01/10/2023Reply brief filedAppellant
12/21/2022Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
11/17/2022Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Document
08/25/2023Mandate issued
06/28/2023Motion for rehearing was not filed
06/28/2023Motion for rehearing due
06/28/2023Motion for rehearing enbanc due
06/13/2023Judgment Issued
06/13/2023Memorandum opinion issuedAffirm TC judgment
02/22/2023Submitted
01/10/2023Reply brief filed
01/10/2023Reply brief due
01/09/2023Set for submission on briefs
01/06/2023Appellees brief due
12/21/2022Brief filed - oral argument not requested
12/21/2022Case ready to be set
12/07/2022Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/07/2022Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
12/07/2022Appellees brief due
11/17/2022Brief filed - oral argument not requested
11/17/2022Appellants brief due
10/18/2022Opinion withdrawn
10/18/2022Motion for rehearing disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/18/2022Rehearing
10/18/2022Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
09/15/2022Response due
09/08/2022Response requested by the court
08/31/2022Motion for rehearing enbanc due
08/31/2022Motion for rehearing due
08/29/2022Appellants brief due
08/23/2022Motion for rehearing filed
08/18/2022Fee paid
08/16/2022Memorandum opinion issuedWithdraw this Court's opinion
08/16/2022Judgment withdrawn
08/15/2022Submitted
07/27/2022Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedExtension of time to file GRANTED, with no further extensions
07/27/2022Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
07/27/2022Appellants brief due
07/26/2022Supplemental clerks record filed
06/28/2022Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGrant motion to extend time; absent extraordinary circumstances, Court will not grant additional motions to extend time
06/27/2022Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
06/27/2022Appellants brief due
06/13/2022Reporters record due
06/07/2022Reporters record filed
06/06/2022Response due
06/03/2022Order enteredIssue sua sponte order
05/16/2022Reporters record due
05/09/2022Clerks record filed
05/05/2022Past due court fee notice
05/05/2022Response due
05/04/2022Order enteredIssue sua sponte order
05/04/2022Court fee due
05/04/2022Docketing statement due
04/26/2022Case began in court of appeals
04/26/2022Notice of appeal received
04/25/2022No payment arrangements made with trial court clerk for record
04/25/2022Notice filed
04/22/2022Record due
04/14/2022Case began in court of appeals
04/14/2022Notice of appeal received
04/12/2022Notice of appeal filed in trial court
03/24/2022Judgment signed by trial court judge
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/25/2023Case StoredCase stored
08/25/2029RetentionDate civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Carpenter , BryceAppellantLema Barazi
Feras Mousilli
Elizabeth Michele Revere
Daspit Law Firm, PLLC AppelleeRobert Emmett Morse
Kiernan "Kier" McAlpine
Robert Morse
Trial Court Information
189th District Court
Harris
Honorable Judge 189th District Court
2022-13046
Court Reporter 189th District Court