judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-3478
B-3478
07/14/1972
Application for Writ of Error
JAMES L. REID AND E. H. BAEZA, KISTENMACHER ENGINEERING COMPANY, INC. AND GEORGE KISTENMACHER
EL PASO CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, FARAH MANUFACTURING COMPANY, INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/07/1973Reply to ResponsePetitioner
04/27/1973Motion for RehearingPetitioner
12/21/1972Brief on the MeritsPetitioner
07/14/1972Response to PetitionRespondent
07/14/1972Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
07/14/1972Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/07/1973Reply to Response
05/03/1973Response to Motion filed
04/27/1973Motion for RehearingOverruled
04/11/1973Opinion issued
12/21/1972Brief on the Merits
12/13/1972Document received (See Remarks)
12/13/1972Document received (See Remarks)
12/13/1972Document received (See Remarks)
12/12/1972Document received (See Remarks)
07/14/1972Response to Petition
07/14/1972Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
07/14/1972Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
07/14/1972Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
El Paso Construction CompanyRespondent
James L. Reid and E. H. BaezaPetitioner
Farah Manufacturing Company, Inc.Respondent
Kistenmacher Engineering Company, Inc. and George KistenmacherPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information