judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HUNT (MISTI-HANA) VS. STATE

Case Information: 33418
Short Caption:HUNT (MISTI-HANA) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C151412BClassification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/03/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
12/03/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 98-00236
01/04/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 99-00002
01/04/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 99-00003
01/19/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. Mailed on: express mail-no postmark. 99-00367
02/16/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Rough draft transcripts from court reporter Joey D'Amato due: no more than 10 days after the date of this order. 99-01034
02/23/1999TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. 08/24/98; 08/25/98; and 08/26/98 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Joseph A. D'Amato. 99-01242
03/17/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Judgment: "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99A-CY/MS/ML 99-01922
04/13/1999RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 99-02788
04/13/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/05/1999RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 22, 1999. 99-02788