judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RICHARD COFFINBERRY v. THE TOWN OF THERMOPOLIS

Case Heading (S-07-0261)
Case Number:S-07-0261Case Docketed On:11/13/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Hot Springs CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Cities and Towns (Title 15)
Short Title:RICHARD COFFINBERRY v. THE TOWN OF THERMOPOLIS
Full Title:RICHARD A. COFFINBERRY, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. THE TOWN OF THERMOPOLIS, a Municipal Corporation, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRichard A. Coffinberry Pro Se
AppelleeThe Town of ThermopolisMichael S. Messenger
Thomas Wade Redmon

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Landlord and Tenant, Other
Opinion Number:2008 WY 43
Citation:183 P.3d 1136

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
11/13/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
11/13/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
11/13/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
11/13/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/12/2007Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
01/15/2008Brief - Appellee; received copy of designation of record on appealBriefAppelleeFinal
01/18/2008Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
02/04/2008Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
02/04/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
02/11/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal, one volume, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
02/11/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
04/10/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Chief Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/28/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/28/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
04/28/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/28/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
05/02/2008Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal