judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RECCO A. BOUKNIGHT V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CO-1135
Short Caption:RECCO A. BOUKNIGHT V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Sentencing Issues only
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:FEL6550-90Filed Date:09/08/2010

Opening Event Date:09/08/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/21/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/10/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRecco A. Bouknight YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
09/08/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
09/15/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on September 8, 2010, and it appearing that appellant was found eligible for cost-waived status in the trial court, and it further appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index and record copies in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (By: JAC)
09/21/2010RECORD INDEX
09/21/2010RECORD COPIES
09/21/2010RECORD COMPLETED
09/23/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
11/10/2010 On consideration of this court's order of September 23, 2010, directing appellant to file the brief, and the limited appendix, as required by D.C.App. R. 30 (f), within 40 days and it appearing that the brief and the limited appendix have not been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that the brief of appellant and the limited appendix shall be submitted within 20 days from the date of this order, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice. See D.C. App. R. 13. (Castillo)
11/30/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF
11/30/2010APPENDIX to Appellant's Brief.
02/15/2011 It appearing that the brief and limited appendix of appendix have been filed with this court, and and it further appearing that the brief of appellee was due to be filed on or before January 5, 2011, (See D.C. App. R. 31), but the brief has not been filed, it is ORDERED that appellee shall within 20 days from the date of this order submit the brief, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the brief, or to request an extension of time within which to do so. (Castillo)
03/07/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF LW
03/07/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
03/08/2011TMC - appellee's motion to file out of time - oppo - motion for summary affirmance - oppo & motion for reversal
04/06/2011APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION - TO MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE LW
04/06/2011APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION - TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE & ...MOTION FOR REVERSAL...TITLED APPELLANT'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL CROSS MOTION for Summarry Disposition and Motion to Strike Appellee's Motion for Summary Affirmance. LW
05/19/2011 ORDERED that APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION of time to file opposition and cross-motion IS GRANTED and the Clerk shall file the lodged opposition and motion for summary affirmance. It is *****MORE******
05/19/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE IS GRANTED...SEE HARDCOPY It is ****MORE****
05/19/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY REVERSAL IS DENIED. It is ****MORE*****
05/19/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLEE'S MOTION for an extension of time IS DENIED AS MOOT. It is ****MORE*****
05/19/2011 FURTHER ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the order on appeal IS AFFIRMED. (RZTHPR)
06/10/2011MANDATE ISSUED