judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

ENPLAT II, LLC, PLATFORM II, LLC AND SIMMONS BANK F/K/A SOUTHWEST BANK, MANAGEMENT v. DEVON ENERGY PRODUCTION COMPANY, LP, EASTLAND OIL CO., SPINNAKER INVESTMENTS, LP, CALLON (PERMIAN) LLC F/K/A CARRIZO (PERMIAN) LLC, TILDEN CAPITAL MINERALS, LLC, PEGASUS RESOURCES, LLC, THE WOODLANDS VENTURE CAPITAL COMPANY, MAP2009-OK, JOURNEY OIL & GAS, INC., EASCO, LLC, TERRY JENNINGS, AS TRUSTEE OF THE TJS TRUST, WALKER ROYALTY, LP, BEVERLY GAY NICHOLS, GREGORY P. MILLER, BOYD D. MCMILLAN AND DELFINA L. MCMILLAN

Case: 23-0663
23-0663
08/18/2023
Petition for Review originally filed as 53.7(f)
ENPLAT II, LLC, PLATFORM II, LLC AND SIMMONS BANK F/K/A SOUTHWEST BANK, MANAGEMENT
DEVON ENERGY PRODUCTION COMPANY, LP, EASTLAND OIL CO., SPINNAKER INVESTMENTS, LP, CALLON (PERMIAN) LLC F/K/A CARRIZO (PERMIAN) LLC, TILDEN CAPITAL MINERALS, LLC, PEGASUS RESOURCES, LLC, THE WOODLANDS VENTURE CAPITAL COMPANY, MAP2009-OK, JOURNEY OIL & GAS, INC., EASCO, LLC, TERRY JENNINGS, AS TRUSTEE OF THE TJS TRUST, WALKER ROYALTY, LP, BEVERLY GAY NICHOLS, GREGORY P. MILLER, BOYD D. MCMILLAN AND DELFINA L. MCMILLAN
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Remarks Document
03/04/2024Response to PetitionRespondentJoint Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Devon Energy Production Company, LP, et al.
11/27/2023Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of Enplat II, LLC, et al.
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Remarks Document
03/04/2024Response to PetitionJoint Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Devon Energy Production Company, LP, et al.
02/02/2024Supreme Court of Texas Requested ResponseRequested response to petition for review due no later than March 4, 2024.
01/02/2024Case forwarded to Court
12/19/2023Response Waiver filedResponse Waiver filed on behalf of Devon Energy Production Company, LP, et al.
11/27/2023Petition for ReviewPetition for Review filed on behalf of Enplat II, LLC, et al.
10/23/2023Third Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Third Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review is granted. Petition for Review is due November 27, 2023. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL NOT BE CONSIDERED.
10/23/2023Third Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filedUnopposed Third Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Enplat II, LLC, et al.
09/21/2023Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedSecond Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review is granted. Petition for Review is due October 25, 2023. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED.
09/21/2023Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filedUnopposed Second Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Enplat II, LLC, et al.
08/18/2023Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review is granted. Petition for Review is due September 25, 2023.
08/18/2023Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Enplat II, LLC, et al.
08/18/2023Clerk's Record
08/18/2023Court reporter/recorder's record
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
01/02/2024Work-Up by Staff / Review by JusticesUnder Review
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Map2009-OK, Journey Oil & Gas, Inc., Easco, LLC and Terry Jennings, as Trustee of the TJS TrustRespondentMr. Samuel Stennis  
Boyd D. McMillan and Delfina L. McMillanRespondentMr. W. Clayton Gaston
Enplat II, LLC and Platform II, LLCPetitionerMr. Connor R. Bourland
Mr. Henry John Paoli
Mr. Brandon Durrett
Mr. Conrad D. Hester
Mr. Scott A. Brister
Robert Biedrzycki
Ms. Reagan Marble
Mr. Robert C. Vartabedian
Walker Royalty, LP, Beverly Gay Nichols and Gregory P. MillerRespondentJames P. Murphy
Simmons Bank f/k/a Southwest Bank, ManagementPetitionerMr. Henry John Paoli
Ms. Reagan Marble
Robert Biedrzycki
Mr. P. Keith Staubus
Mr. Brandon Durrett
Devon Energy Production Company, LP, Eastland Oil Co., Spinnaker Investments, LP, Callon (permian) LLC f/k/a Carrizo (Permian) LLC, Tilden Capital Minerals, LLC, Pegasus Resources, LLC and The Woodlands Venture Capital CompanyRespondentMr. Derek L. Montgomery
Mr. David E. Keltner
Ms. Anna Brandl
Mr. Joseph "Joe" R. Greenhill III
Mr. Jeffrey Kuhnhenn
Court of Appeals Information:
08-21-00217-CV
Reverse & Remand
___ SW3d ___, 07-10-23
8th Court of Appeals
Honorable Lisa J. Soto
Trial Court Information
143rd District Court
Reeves
Honorable John (Mike) M. Swanson
17-05-21958-CVR