Case: 02-23-00213-CR
02-23-00213-CR
08/18/2023
Poss of Marihuana
Julian Alejandro Andrade
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
01/09/2024 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||
01/03/2024 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||
12/21/2023 | Notice of late brief |
| |||
11/20/2023 | Electronic Clerks Record Filed |
| |||
11/16/2023 | Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed |
| |||
10/23/2023 | Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed |
| |||
10/13/2023 | Motion to withdraw attorney disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||
10/12/2023 | Motion to withdraw attorney filed |
| |||
08/29/2023 | Docketing statement filed |
| |||
08/18/2023 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/19/2024 | Status | Appellee brief due |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Andrade, Julian Alejandro | Criminal - Appellant | Brian W. Salvant |
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Steven W. Conder |
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 4
Tarrant
Honorable Andy Porter
1701463
Court Reporter, Criminal District Court No. 4
50 Yrs TDCJ, $322 Fine