Case: 05-22-00517-CV
05-22-00517-CV
05/27/2022
Miscellaneous/other civil
Andromeda Jones-Gilder
Dequayan Keith Gilder
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
11/21/2022 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellee |
| ||||
10/21/2022 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellant |
| ||||
08/31/2022 | Brief was not filed | Appellant |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
07/10/2023 | Mandate issued |
| |||||
06/16/2023 | Sent to publisher | | |||||
04/27/2023 | Memorandum opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||||
04/27/2023 | Retention time case file will be retained | Destroy | | ||||
04/26/2023 | Submitted | | |||||
03/08/2023 | Set for submission on briefs |
| |||||
11/21/2022 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
11/21/2022 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested |
| |||||
11/20/2022 | Appellees brief due | | |||||
10/21/2022 | Brief filed - oral argument requested |
| |||||
10/21/2022 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
10/03/2022 | Order entered | Otherwise Disposed |
| ||||
09/21/2022 | Appearance of counsel |
| |||||
08/31/2022 | Brief was not filed |
| |||||
08/27/2022 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
07/27/2022 | Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed |
| |||||
07/27/2022 | No reporters record filed in civil case |
| |||||
07/25/2022 | Record due | | |||||
05/31/2022 | Electronic Clerks Record Filed |
| |||||
05/27/2022 | Docketing statement due |
| |||||
05/27/2022 | Fee requested |
| |||||
05/27/2022 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
| |||||
05/26/2022 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
04/27/2029 | Retention | Date civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate) |
07/10/2023 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Gilder, DeQuayan | Appellee | Debra White |
Jones-Gilder, Andromeda | Appellant | Andromeda Jones-Gilder Frank M. Adler |
Trial Court Information
302nd Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Sandra L. Jackson
DF-21-01650
Melva Key