Case: PD-0079-23
PD-0079-23
02/07/2023
PDR Case Type
KENDRICK, BRYANT
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
06/14/2023 | RETURNED TO COA -- 69.4 T.R.A.P |
| |||||
05/17/2023 | PDR DISP | Refused |
| ||||
04/21/2023 | MOT SUSPEND 68.4(J) | Granted |
| ||||
04/21/2023 | MOT SUSPEND 68.4(J) |
| |||||
04/21/2023 | MOT SUSPEND 9.3(B) | Granted |
| ||||
04/21/2023 | MOT SUSPEND 9.3(B) |
| |||||
04/20/2023 | MISC DOCUMENT FOR A PDR |
| |||||
04/14/2023 | PDR FILED |
| |||||
02/07/2023 | EXT PDR DISP/NFE | Granted |
| ||||
02/07/2023 | EXT PDR FILED |
| |||||
02/07/2023 | COA RECORD RECEIVED | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
06/14/2023 | STORED | RETURNED COA |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
STATE OF TEXAS | State | |
KENDRICK, BRYANT | Appellant | BRYANT KENDRICK |
Court of Appeals Information:
04-21-00499-CR
4th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
454th District Court
Medina
Honorable Medina County 454th District Court
18-07-12941-CR