judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KAHRE VS. NEVADA STATE BANK

Case Information: 33419
Short Caption:KAHRE VS. NEVADA STATE BANKCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 33601 , 33684
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A323777Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:MaupinCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/03/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Robert Kahre--USPS Money Order #69746417032.
12/03/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 98-00237
03/08/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Order Dismissing Proper Person Appeals and Denying Proper Person Petition for Writ of Mandamus. Despite clear warnings, Kahre and Nelson have submitted additionald frivoulous papers, pleadings and documetns in this matter. We are compelled to take the following actions. Judgment: "We dismiss these appeals and deny this petition for a writ of mandamus." fn2 [We deny as moot petitioners' motion for a stay of enforcement of all sanctions, orders, and judgments pending our decision.] We sanction Kahre in the amount of $3,000. Kahre shall pay this sanction to the Nevada Supreme Court law Library, and shall provide poof of payment to the clerk of this court within 30 days from the date of this order. We permanently enjoin Kahre and Nelson from submitting for filing in this court any papers, pleadings or documents whatsoever in these matters. If Kahre and Nelson attempt to submit any further papers, pleadings or documents in these matters, we direct the clerk to return them to Kahre and Nelson, unfiled. fn3 [The Honorable A. William Maupin, Justice, voluntarily recused himself from participation in the decision of these matters.] SNP99A-RR/DA/NB. Nos. 33419, 33601, 33684 (not consolidated). 99-01585
03/24/1999Other Returned Unfiled Document. Letter, Appellant's Opening Brief, and Appendix to Appellant's Opening Brief, vols. 1 and 2, returned, unfiled, pursuant to this court's order of March 8, 1999.
04/05/1999RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 99-02511
04/05/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/26/1999RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 20, 1999. 99-02511
06/28/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice from U.S. Supreme Court\Certiorari Granted. The petition for a writ of certiorari was filed June 7, 1999, and placed on the docket June 21, 1999 as No. 98-2031. Nos. 33419, 33601, 33684. 99-05651
10/12/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice from U.S. Supreme Court\Certiorari Granted. The petition for a writ of certiorari is denied. 99-09872
12/02/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice from U.S. Supreme Court\Certiorari Granted. The petition for rehearing is denied. 99-12069