judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JOSEPH H. HITTNER v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

Case Heading (S-07-0262)
Case Number:S-07-0262Case Docketed On:11/13/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - City, County, State and Local Powers (Title 16)
Short Title:JOSEPH H. HITTNER v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
Full Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION DRIVER'S LICENSE ACTION INVOLVING JOSEPH H. HITTNER: JOSEPH H. HITTNER, Appellant (Petitioner), v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJoseph H. HittnerFrank R. Chapman
Tamara Schroeder Crolla
Thomas A. Valdez
AppelleeDepartment of TransportationBruce A. Salzburg
Robin Sessions Cooley

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Administrative Law and Procedure, Other
Opinion Number:2008 WY 91
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
11/13/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
11/13/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
11/13/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
11/13/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter - noticed that Mr. Guthrie's address was different - sent to Pioneer address.Notice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/27/2007Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
02/12/2008Brief - Appellee, received copy of brief on disk and designation of recordBriefAppelleeFinal
02/15/2008Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
03/03/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
03/04/2008Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
03/12/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal, three volumes. Volumes I-II, original papers; Volume III, agency record.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
03/12/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
08/01/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
08/19/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
08/19/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
08/19/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
08/19/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
08/25/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 8/22/08.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal