judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

VERNON A. WEBB V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CO-1136
Short Caption:VERNON A. WEBB V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Den. Of Post-Conviction Relief
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:FEL6863-01Filed Date:09/08/2010

Opening Event Date:09/08/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/21/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/13/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantVernon A. Webb YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
09/08/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
09/15/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on September 8, 2010, and it appearing that appellant was found eligible for cost-waived status in the trial court, and it further appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index and record copies in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (By: JAC)
09/21/2010RECORD INDEX
09/21/2010RECORD COPIES
09/21/2010RECORD COMPLETED
09/23/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
11/29/2010 On consideration of this court's order of September 23, 2010, directing appellant to file the brief, and the limited appendix, as required by D.C.App. R. 30 (f), within 40 days and it appearing that the brief and the limited appendix have not been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that the brief of appellant and the limited appendix shall be submitted within 20 days from the date of this order, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice. See D.C. App. R. 13. (By: JAC)
12/22/2010ORDER: This appeal is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13. (By: ETW)
01/13/2011MANDATE ISSUED
02/05/2013LodgedMotion To Appoint Counsel to file 23-110 (Appellant)