Case: 01-23-00615-CV
01-23-00615-CV
08/22/2023
Contract
Ramesh Kapur Individually and d/b/a AIC Management Company
Nicia Vitorino
No
www.txcourts.gov/1stcoa
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
12/07/2023 | Fee paid |
| |||||||
12/01/2023 | Mandate issued |
| |||||||
10/12/2023 | Response due | | |||||||
10/06/2023 | Response due | | |||||||
10/06/2023 | Response due | | |||||||
09/19/2023 | Memorandum opinion issued | Dismiss appeal |
| ||||||
09/19/2023 | Judgment Issued |
| |||||||
09/19/2023 | Motion to dismiss disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||||
09/18/2023 | Submitted | | |||||||
09/12/2023 | Past due court fee notice |
| |||||||
09/11/2023 | Court fee due | | |||||||
09/11/2023 | Docketing statement due | | |||||||
09/06/2023 | No payment arrangements made with court reporter for record |
| |||||||
09/06/2023 | No clerks record filed in civil case |
| |||||||
09/04/2023 | Record due | | |||||||
08/31/2023 | Motion to dismiss filed |
| |||||||
08/25/2023 | Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record |
| |||||||
08/22/2023 | Case began in court of appeals |
| |||||||
08/22/2023 | Notice of appeal received |
| |||||||
08/18/2023 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||||
07/06/2023 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
12/01/2023 | Case Stored | Case stored |
12/01/2029 | Retention | Date civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Ramesh Kapur Individually and d/b/a AIC Management Company | Appellant | Colleen M Clear McClure |
Vitorino, Nicia | Appellee |
Trial Court Information
334th District Court
Harris
Honorable Judge 334th District Court
2021-02915
Susan Miller