Case: 02-23-00304-CV
02-23-00304-CV
08/22/2023
Miscellaneous/other civil
Demetrius Ann Newton
Opendoor Property Trust I
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
02/01/2024 | Mandate issued |
| |||||||
11/22/2023 | Memorandum opinion issued | Dismissed-Want of Jurisdiction |
| ||||||
11/21/2023 | Submitted | | |||||||
10/27/2023 | Letter issued by the court for lack of jurisdiction or defect |
| |||||||
10/17/2023 | Electronic Clerks Record Filed | | |||||||
09/25/2023 | Letter issued by the court for lack of jurisdiction or defect |
| |||||||
08/22/2023 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
02/01/2024 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Newton, Demetrius Ann | Appellant | Demetrius Ann Newton |
Opendoor Property Trust I | Appellee | Michael Francis |
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 3
Tarrant
Honorable Mike Hrabal
2023-004860-3
Court Reporter, County Court At Law No. 3