Case: 14-23-00592-CV
14-23-00592-CV
08/17/2023
Miscellaneous/other civil
Munich Reinsurance America, Inc., formerly known as American Re-Insurance Company (improperly plead herein as "American Excess Insurance Company, now known as Executive Risk Indemnity, Inc.") ("MRAm")
Henry Vogt Machine Co., Inc., by and through its duly appointed Trustee, Robert L. Pendergraft
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
12/11/2023 | Reply brief filed | Appellant |
| ||||
11/20/2023 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellee |
| ||||
09/11/2023 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellant |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/06/2024 | Submitted | | |||||
02/01/2024 | Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied |
| |||||
01/08/2024 | Letter filed |
| |||||
12/11/2023 | Reply brief filed |
| |||||
11/20/2023 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested |
| |||||
11/20/2023 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
11/20/2023 | Appellees brief due | | |||||
10/02/2023 | Appellees brief due | | |||||
09/21/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | DISMISSED AS MOOT |
| ||||
09/21/2023 | Order entered |
| |||||
09/21/2023 | Motion to consolidate disposed | GRANTED | | ||||
09/15/2023 | Supplemental clerks record filed |
| |||||
09/11/2023 | Response filed |
| |||||
09/11/2023 | Brief filed - oral argument requested |
| |||||
09/11/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
09/11/2023 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
09/06/2023 | Reporters record due | | |||||
09/01/2023 | Mediation docketing statement returned |
| |||||
09/01/2023 | Docketing statement filed |
| |||||
09/01/2023 | Docketing statement due | | |||||
08/28/2023 | Response filed |
| |||||
08/28/2023 | Motion to consolidate filed |
| |||||
08/28/2023 | Court fee due | | |||||
08/23/2023 | Notification received that no record was taken | | |||||
08/23/2023 | Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record |
| |||||
08/22/2023 | Notice of late record |
| |||||
08/22/2023 | Clerks record filed |
| |||||
08/21/2023 | Reporters record due | | |||||
08/21/2023 | Fee paid |
| |||||
08/21/2023 | Record due | | |||||
08/17/2023 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||
08/17/2023 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||
08/17/2023 | Case began in court of appeals |
| |||||
08/10/2023 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
07/21/2023 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/06/2024 | Submitted | Submitted on briefs |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Munich Reinsurance America, Inc., formerly known as American Re-Insurance Company (improperly plead herein as "American Excess Insurance Company, now known as Executive Risk Indemnity, Inc.") ("MRAm") | Appellant | Robbie Moehlmann |
Henry Vogt Machine Co., Inc., by and through its duly appointed Trustee, Robert L. Pendergraft | Appellee | Noah Horwitz Bryan O. Blevins JR. Brady Edwards |
Trial Court Information
11th District Court
Harris
Honorable Judge, 11th District Court
2004-03964
Mark Miller