judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

BOARD OF INSURANCE COMMISSIONERS OF TEXAS v. GREAT SOUTHERN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, HOUSTON BANK AND TRUST COMPANY AND TEXAS BANKERS ASSOCIATION, HOUSTON BANK AND TRUST COMPANY, TRUSTEE, TEXAS BANKERS ASSOCIATION

Case: A-2886
A-2886
06/19/1950
Certified Question from the U. S. Court of Appeals
BOARD OF INSURANCE COMMISSIONERS OF TEXAS
GREAT SOUTHERN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, HOUSTON BANK AND TRUST COMPANY AND TEXAS BANKERS ASSOCIATION, HOUSTON BANK AND TRUST COMPANY, TRUSTEE, TEXAS BANKERS ASSOCIATION
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/17/1951Motion for RehearingRespondent
05/16/1951Motion for RehearingRespondent
05/16/1951Motion for RehearingRespondent
03/16/1951Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
01/17/1951Brief on the MeritsPetitioner
01/06/1951Errata FiledRespondent
01/03/1951Brief on the MeritsRespondent
01/02/1951Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
01/02/1951Brief on the MeritsRespondent
10/09/1950Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filedRespondent
10/02/1950Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
09/27/1950Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
09/27/1950Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
09/21/1950Reply to ResponsePetitioner
09/14/1950Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
09/12/1950Response to PetitionRespondent
09/11/1950Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
09/11/1950Response to PetitionRespondent
08/31/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
06/19/1950Certified Question filed
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/30/1951Letter Filed
06/13/1951Opinion issued on motion for rehearing
05/17/1951Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/16/1951Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/16/1951Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/02/1951Opinion issued
03/16/1951Supplemental Brief filed
01/17/1951Brief on the Merits
01/06/1951Errata Filed
01/03/1951Brief on the Merits
01/02/1951Supplemental Brief filed
01/02/1951Brief on the Merits
11/15/1950Document received (See Remarks)
11/15/1950Document received (See Remarks)
11/15/1950Document received (See Remarks)
11/15/1950Document received (See Remarks)
11/15/1950Document received (See Remarks)
11/15/1950Document received (See Remarks)
11/15/1950Document received (See Remarks)
10/09/1950Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filed
10/02/1950Amicus Curiae Brief received
09/27/1950Amicus Curiae Brief received
09/27/1950Amicus Curiae Brief received
09/21/1950Reply to Response
09/14/1950Amicus Curiae Brief received
09/12/1950Additional Copies received
09/12/1950Response to Petition
09/11/1950Amicus Curiae Brief received
09/11/1950Response to Petition
08/31/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
08/31/1950Document received (See Remarks)
06/19/1950Certified Question filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas Association of Life UnderwritersAmicus Curiae
Century Life Insurance CompanyAmicus Curiae
Houston Bank and Trust Company, TrusteeRespondent
Texas Bankers AssociationRespondent
Great Southern Life Insurance CompanyRespondent
Board of Insurance Commissioners of TexasPetitioner
American National Insurance Company, et al.Amicus Curiae
Great American Reserve Insurance CompanyAmicus Curiae
Houston Bank and Trust Company and Texas Bankers AssociationRespondent
Western Reserve Life Insurance CompanyAmicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information