judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

AREVALO (CARLOS) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34829
Short Caption:AREVALO (CARLOS) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C152791Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:05/14/2001 at 2:30 PMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas Office
Submission Date:05/14/2001How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/15/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/15/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-08699
09/30/1999Order/CounselFiled Order/Fast Track/Counsel. Appellant filed his notice of appeal in proper person.This appeal is governed by NRAP 3C. Attorney Craig Jorgenson shall file the transcript request form within10 days and a fast track statement within 40 days. 99-09373
10/19/1999TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 10/29/98, 11/2/98, 1/21/99, 8/5/99. Court Reporter: Maureen Schorn. 99-10131
11/08/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 99-10943
11/16/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 8/28/98, 10/19/98. Court Reporter: Joseph A. D'Amato. 99-11359
11/24/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's counsel shall, within 15 days of the date of this order, file with this court the fast track statement. 99-11786
12/27/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 99-13137
01/20/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the fast track statement provisionally submitted with the motion for an extension of time on December 27, 1999. 00-00895
01/20/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 99-13139
01/20/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 99-13140
01/21/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 00-00957
01/21/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Response. 00-00958
05/22/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Full Briefing. We have determined that full briefing will assist the court in the disposition of this appeal. Opening brief and appendix due: 40 days. fn2[We suspend the requirement in NRAP9 for counsel to file a certified transcript.] Answering brief and reply brief shall be filed in compliance with NRAP 31. 00-08556
07/05/2000MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: July 31, 2000. 00-11400
08/03/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 00-13425
08/09/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. Appellant's opening brief and appendix shall be served and filed on or before August 30, 2000. 00-13803
09/01/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. 00-15524
09/29/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. 00-17208
11/03/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On August 2, 2000, appellant submitted a proper person document entitled, "motion to dismiss/withdraw a direct appeal." Appellant hs not sought, nor been granted, permission to file proper person documents in this appeal. We direct the clerk of this court to return, unfiled, the proper person document received on August 2, 2000. Appellant shall proceed hereafter by and through counsel and shall address all concerns relating to this appeal to his counsel. 00-19307
11/03/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to appellant Carlos A. Arevalo: returned unfiled, the original proper person Motion to Dismiss/Withdraw a Direct Appeal received on August 2, 2000.
04/26/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on May 14, 2001 at 2:30 p.m. in Las Vegas. (SNP01A-CY/ML/NB)
04/30/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
05/14/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Before the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP01A-CY/ML/NB
06/12/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. 'ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED.' SNP01A-CY/ML/NB 01-09758
07/10/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-10318
07/10/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/26/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 12, 2001. 01-10318