judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DONNELL L. LONGUS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-1185
Short Caption:DONNELL L. LONGUS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF1-22986-06Filed Date:09/20/2010

Opening Event Date:09/20/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:04/11/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/05/2011
Argued/Submitted:03/27/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/05/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDonnell L. Longus Y
Thomas PaynterYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Sean M. Lewis NN
Nicholas P. ColemanYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
09/20/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
10/07/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Sydney J. Hoffman, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
10/07/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Sydney J. Hoffman, Esquire
10/29/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
12/07/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (11 pgs/Wood) 1/4/10 proc.
12/07/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (52 pgs/Wood) 1/5/10 proc.
12/07/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (188 pgs/Wood) 1/6/10 proc.
12/07/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (95 pgs/Wood) 1/7/10 proc.
12/07/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (139 pgs/Wood) 1/8/10 proc.
12/07/2010FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (297 pgs/Hunt) 1/11-14/10 proc. w/cd
12/29/2010RECORD INDEX
12/29/2010RECORD COPIES
12/29/2010FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #7 (Superior Court Filings and Court Orders)***SEALED***(2 copies)
04/11/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #8 (5 pgs/tape) 10/27/06 proc.
04/11/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #9 (4 pgs/tape) 11/9/06 proc.
04/11/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #10 (10 pgs/tape) 1/23/07 proc.
04/11/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #11 (5 pgs/tape) 4/5/07 proc.
04/11/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #12 (5 pgs/tape) 5/7/07 proc.
04/11/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #13 (8 pgs/tape) 5/16/07 proc.
04/11/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #14 (7 pgs/tape) 10/29/07 proc.
04/11/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #15 (11 pgs/tape) 6/19/09 proc.
04/11/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #16 (3 pgs/tape) 6/22/09 proc.
04/11/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #17 (8 pgs/tape) 6/23/09 proc.
04/11/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #18 (5 pgs/tape) 6/26/09 proc.
04/11/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #19 (22 pgs/tape) 6/30/09 proc.
04/11/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #20 (9 pgs/Gilliam) 8/18/09 proc.
04/11/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #21 (5 pgs/Wood) 4/30/10 proc.
04/11/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #22 (14 pgs/Maddox) 9/10/10 proc.
04/11/2011RECORD COMPLETED
04/29/2011ORDERED, sua sponte, that the appointment of Sydney Hoffman, Esquire, is hereby vacated, and Tom Paynter, Esquire, is appointed to represent appellant herein. Sydney Hoffman, Esquire, shall transmit all documents pertaining to this appeal to newly-appointed counsel forthwith. (ETW)
04/29/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #23 (31 pgs/Hollings) 11/21/06 proc. w/cd
04/29/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #24 (11 pgs/Allison) 7/24/09 proc.
05/05/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
06/09/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo 30 days
06/09/2011APPEARANCE- of Thomas C. Paynter on behalf of aplt
06/15/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before July 14, 2011. (JAC)
07/14/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief for 60 days (no oppo). (Appellant)
07/28/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief to 9/12/11
09/12/2011FiledBrief (Appendix Attached) (Appellant)
09/12/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant)
10/11/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)
10/21/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief - until December 5, 2011 and notice of receipt of additional transcripts (Appellee)
11/17/2011FiledMotion To Supplement The Record (Appellee)
11/28/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellee's motions for extensions of time to file the brief and motion to supplement the record.
12/01/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #25 (attachment A - testimony of Det Xanten)
12/05/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
12/05/2011FiledBriefing Completed
01/03/2012FiledMiscellaneous Motion and Affidavit to Hold Appeal in Abeyance to Allow Completion of Section 23-110 Motion to Vacate. (Appellant)
01/12/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
01/30/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
02/08/2012FiledMotion Requesting Argument (Appellant)Granted
02/27/2012FiledOrder Granting aplt's motion for oral argument.
03/27/2012FiledArgued Before Glickman,Thompson,Schwelb Thomas Paynter Esq.,for appellant Nicholas P. Coleman Esq.,for appellee
03/28/2012FiledDenied as moot aplt's motion and affidavit to hold appeal in abeyance.
05/14/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Glickman and Thompson, Associate Judges, and Schwelb, Senior Judge.)
06/05/2012FiledMandate
11/02/2012FiledNotice Of Denial Of Pet. For Writ Of Certiorari (Appellant)