judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

EMANUEL JEROME JENKINS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-1184
Short Caption:EMANUEL JEROME JENKINS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Bribery
Lead:10-CF-1184Consolidated: 10-CF-1232
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF1-20178-08Filed Date:09/20/2010

Opening Event Date:09/20/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:11/14/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/31/2012
Argued/Submitted:02/13/2013
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/24/2015
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
Amicus CuriaePublic Defender ServiceN
James W. KleinNY
Christine A. Monta YN
AppellantEmanuel JenkinsY
Abram J. PaffordYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Elizabeth H. DanelloYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
09/20/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
10/07/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that David Deitch, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
10/07/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) David Deitch, Esquire
11/08/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
12/23/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (47-pgs/johnson 9/19/08 proc.)
12/30/2010RECORD INDEX
12/30/2010RECORD COPIES
12/30/2010FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (SEALED pleadings)
03/24/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (26 pgs/Janifer) 9/17/10 proc. w/cd
03/31/2011COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS Granted
03/31/2011CHANGE OF ADDRESS RECEIVED Atty Deitch, 1627 Eye St., NW, # 1100, 2006
04/18/2011ORDERED that the motion of counsel for appellant is granted and the appointment of David B. Deitch, Esquire, is hereby vacated, and Abram Pafford, Esquire, is appointed to represent appellant herein. David B. Deitch, Esquire, shall transmit all documents pertaining to this appeal to newly-appointed counsel forthwith. (ETW)
11/14/2011FiledRecord Completed
11/16/2011FiledBriefing Order
12/22/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
01/09/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief and limited appendix to 1/26/12.
01/30/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
02/03/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) to 2/27/12.
02/27/2012FiledBrief (Appellant)
02/27/2012FiledAppendix (Appellant)
04/02/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
04/20/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee) to 6/1/12.
05/31/2012FiledBrief (Appellee)
05/31/2012FiledAppendix (Appellee)
05/31/2012FiledBriefing Completed
06/01/2012FiledAmended/Corrected Brief (Appellee)
06/25/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Regular
06/25/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Reply Brief (Appellant)Granted
07/02/2012FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
07/03/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Reply Brief (Appellant) to 7/12/12
07/11/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Reply Brief (Appellant)Granted
07/13/2012FiledMotion To Consolidate with 10-CF-1232. (Appellee)Granted
07/13/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellee)
08/09/2012FiledOrder Granting Motion To Consolidate with 10-CF-1232. (Appellee) and Motion For Extension Of Time to File lodged Reply Brief (Appellant) in appeal no. 10-CF-1184
08/09/2012FiledReply Brief (Appellant) in appeal no. 10-CF-1184
08/20/2012FiledAppendix (10-CF-1232) (Appellee)
08/20/2012FiledBrief (10-CF-1232) (Appellee)
11/28/2012FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
11/28/2012FiledRule 28(k) Citation Of Supplemental Authority (Appellee)
12/04/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellee)
12/21/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
02/06/2013FiledRule 28(k) Citation Of Supplemental Authority (Appellant)
02/13/2013FiledArgued before Judges Glickman, Oberly, Reid, Richard S. Stolker, Esq. for appellant Azariah Israel Abram J. Pafford, Esq. for appellant Emanuel J. Jenkins Elizabeth H. Danello, Esq. for appellee
02/28/2013FiledRule 28(k) Citation Of Supplemental Authority (Israel) (Appellant)
07/01/2013FiledBriefing Order
07/26/2013FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File to supplemental brief Other (Appellee)Granted
08/05/2013FiledSupplemental Brief (Appellant)
08/05/2013FiledSupplemental Brief (Amicus Curiae)
08/05/2013FiledSupplemental Brief (Appellant)
08/05/2013FiledSupplemental Brief (Appellee)
08/09/2013FiledOrder Granting aple's motion for extension to file reply brief.
08/21/2013FiledMotion for clarification of schedule with respect to due dates for supplemental reply brief. (Jenkins) (Appellant)
08/29/2013FiledSupplemental Reply Brief (Appellant- Jenkins)
08/29/2013FiledSupplemental Reply Brief (Appellee)
09/06/2013FiledOrder Granting aplt's motion for clarification.
12/12/2013FiledAffirmed In Part/Reversed In Part (OPINION) (Glickman and Oberly, Associate Judges; and Reid, Senior Judge)
12/18/2013FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File petition for rehearing en banc (Appellee (pii)
12/19/2013FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)
12/24/2013FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Petition for Rehearing En Banc (Appellant) (Jenkins)Granted
01/10/2014FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellee's and appellant's motion for extension of time within which to file the petitions for rehearing or rehearing en banc to January 25, 2014.
01/24/2014FiledPetition For Rehearing En Banc (Appellee)
01/27/2014FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Petition for rehearing/rehearing en banc (Jenkins) (Appellant)Granted
01/30/2014FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc to February 3, 2014. (Jenkins)
02/03/2014FiledPetition For Rehearing En Banc (Jenkins) (Appellant)
02/18/2014FiledOrdered that appellee, within 14 days from the date of this order, shall file a response (ten copies) thereto.
02/24/2014FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Response to Appellant's petition for rehearing en banc Opposition/Reply/Answer (Appellee)Granted
03/04/2014FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file a response to appellant's petition to April 3, 2014.
04/02/2014FiledOpposition to petition for rehearing en banc (Appellee)
07/18/2014FiledOrdered that Richard S. Stolker, Esquire is hereby reappointed as counsel for appellant in appeal no. 10-CF-1232. F/O counsel for appellants and the Public Defender Service shall, within 14 days, each file a response to the government's petition for rehearing en banc.
07/22/2014FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File a response to petition for rehearing en banc (Appellant) (Israel)
07/23/2014FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant Azariah Isreal's motion for an extension of time within which to file a response to August 15, 2014.
07/28/2014FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File a response to petition for en banc rehearing (Amicus Curiae)Granted
08/08/2014FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Opposition/Reply/Answer (Amicus Curiae)Granted
08/19/2014FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to file a response to the petition for rehearing en banc (Israel) (Appellant)Granted
08/21/2014FiledGRANT - Order Granting the Public Defender Service's motions for an extensions of time to file a response to the governments petition are granted and the response shall be filed on August 29, 2014.
08/21/2014FiledOpposition to Petition for Rehearing En Banc (Amicus Curiae)
03/09/2015FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant Azariah Israel's motion for an extension of time to file an opposition to appellee's petition for rehearing en banc is granted, and the Clerk shall file appellant Azariah Israel's lodged opposition to appellee's petition for rehearing en banc.
03/09/2015FiledOpposition to appellee's petition for hearing (Appellant) (Isreal)
03/09/2015FiledOrder Denying appellee's petition for rehearing en banc.
03/09/2015FiledOrder Denying appellant Emanuel Jerome Jenkins' petition for rehearing en banc.
03/24/2015FiledMandate (Jenkins- 10-CF-1184)
06/30/2020FiledMotion To Recall The Mandate (Pro Se Appellant Jenkins)Denied
06/30/2020FiledTMC
07/17/2020FiledORDER DENYING appellant's motion to recall the mandate...