judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WHITE (GEORGE) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34828
Short Caption:WHITE (GEORGE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 44475
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C156910Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/22/2000How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/15/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/15/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for Appellant). 99-08696
09/27/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-09217
09/27/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: April 12, 1999 through April 14, 1999. To Court Reporter: Joe D'Amato. 99-09218
10/07/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. March 12, 1999, April 13, 1999, and April 14, 1999 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Joseph A. D'Amato. 99-09696
01/11/2000MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: February 9, 2000. 00-00449
02/16/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 00-02459
02/22/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. The opening brief and appendix provisionally submitted on February 16, 2000, shall be filed, forthwith. 00-02716
02/22/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Express-no postmark. 00-02460
02/22/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 00-02461
03/17/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. 00-04232
03/22/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On February 2, 2000, we received a proper person letter from appellant. Appellant has neither requested nor been granted leave to file documents in proper person. We direct the clerk of this court to return, unfiled, the proper person submission. Appellant should direct all requests for relief to counsel in the first instance. 00-04596
03/22/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. Returned unfiled with letter to appellant White: original proper person Letter received 02/02/2000.
04/21/2000MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: May 16, 2000. 00-06403
05/15/2000BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. 00-08016
11/22/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 00-20526
11/22/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. SNP00A-1 (CY/RR/NB).
02/07/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding. " . . . we affirm White's conviction of two counts of sexual assualt with a minor under sixteen years of age and two counsts of open or gorss lewdness . . . we reverse his conviction of lewdness on a child under fourteen years of age and remand this matter to the district court for entry of an amended judgment of conviction." SNP00A-1-CY/RR/NB 01-02505
03/06/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-02587
03/06/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/22/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 14, 2001. 01-02587