judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ISQUICK VS. DAVIS

Case Information: 49502
Short Caption:ISQUICK VS. DAVISCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A480566Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:06/05/2007 / Buchanan, WilliamSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/23/2007Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Benson firm - check no. 51957.
05/23/2007Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) 07-11418
05/23/2007Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days. 07-11426
06/05/2007Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: William F. Buchanan. 07-12226
06/14/2007Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. 07-13032
06/19/2007Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. 07-13391
06/27/2007Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 07-14054
06/27/2007Settlement AgreementFiled Settlement Agreement. 07-14055
06/27/2007Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 07-14056
07/09/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). 07-14883
07/09/2007Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.