Case Information: 53385 | |||
Short Caption: | CAPITOL INDEMNITY CORP. VS. ARETOS | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 52124 , 53901 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A517780 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 03/10/2009 / Hoppe, Craig | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/09/2009 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Douglas J. Gardner check no. 09821. | ||
03/09/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 09-05959 | |
03/10/2009 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Craig Hoppe | 09-06099 | |
03/26/2009 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. Capitol Indemnity Corp. | 09-07609 | |
04/03/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement. | 09-08506 | |
04/09/2009 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. Capitol Indemnity Corp d/b/a/Capitol Insurance Companies; John Chojnowski; International Insurance Company. | 09-08889 | |
04/20/2009 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. The premediation conference is continued because the parties have advised that the district court will render a written decision on attorney fees & costs on 4/27/09. The conference is continued to 4/28/09. | 09-09833 | |
06/25/2009 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/Settlement. Following an early case assessment with counsel in No. 53901, appellants will voluntarily dismiss the present appeal, No. 53385. | 09-15790 | |
09/09/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Stipulation or motion to dismiss due: 30 days. | 09-21868 | |
10/29/2009 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. 53385 and 53901. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 09-26609 | |
11/04/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. Appellants have not responded to our previous order to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss this appeal by 10/9/09. Accordingly, "we dismiss this appeal as abandoned." fn1[This dismissal does not affect the pending related appeal No. 53901]. SNP09-RP/MD/KP | 09-26984 | |
11/25/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion to Vacate Order Dismissing Appeal and to Reinstate Appeal | 09-28868 | |
12/11/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Motion to Extend Time to Permit Filing of Opposition to Motion to Reopen Appeal. | 09-30127 | |
12/15/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Association of Counsel. Representing appellant: Beau Sterling, Esq. | 09-30458 | |
02/03/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Consolidate. Capitol Indemnity's Motion to Consolidate Appeals, Correct Caption, and Set Briefing Schedule. Nos. 53901/53385. | 10-02892 | |
02/24/2010 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Opposition to Motion to Consolidate Appeals. Nos. 53385/53901. | 10-04971 | |
02/26/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion for Permission to File Document. Motion for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Consolidate Appeals, Correct Caption, and Set Briefing Schedule. Nos. 53385/53901. | 10-05110 | |
03/10/2010 | Motion | Filed Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. | 10-06361 | |
03/26/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Denying Motions (No 53385) and Dismissing Appeal (No. 53901). ". . . and dismiss the appeal in Docket No. 53901." All pending motions in both dockets are denied as moot in light of this order and the parties' stipulations. Nos. 53385/53901. | 10-07952 | |
04/06/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-08846 | |
04/06/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
04/15/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 9, 2010. | 10-08846 |