judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF CARL L. BALDWIN: STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION v. CARL L. BALDWIN

Case Heading (S-07-0284)
Case Number:S-07-0284Case Docketed On:12/07/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Sweetwater CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF CARL L. BALDWIN: STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION v. CARL L. BALDWIN
Full Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF CARL L. BALDWIN: STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION, Appellant (Petitioner), v. CARL L. BALDWIN, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDepartment of Employment - Workers' Safety and Compensation DivisionBruce A. Salzburg
John William Renneisen
Steven R. Czoschke
Kristi Marie Radosevich
James Michael Causey
AppelleeCarl L. BaldwinDonna D. Domonkos

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Workers' Compensation
Opinion Number:2008 WY 125
Citation:196 P.3d 1087

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
12/07/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
12/07/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
12/07/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
12/07/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/10/2007Rulings-Other Courts/Agencies - Other substitution of counselRulings-Other Courts/AgenciesOtherFinal
01/04/2008Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
01/07/2008Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
02/06/2008Notice-Incoming - Designation of record from counsel for AppellantNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
02/07/2008Brief - Appellant; received copy of brief on diskBriefAppellantFinal
03/24/2008Brief - Appellee and received copy of designation of record on appealBriefAppelleeFinal
03/27/2008Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
04/04/2008Notice-Incoming - Errata to Appellee's briefNotice-IncomingErrataFinal
04/14/2008Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
04/14/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
04/18/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Agency RecordRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
10/10/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Chief Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
10/15/2008Motion - Fees and costsMotionFees and costsFinal
10/17/2008Event - Hardcopy received motion for attorney's fees and costsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/04/2008Order - Awarding attorney fees and costsOrderAwarding attorney fees and costsFinal
11/05/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
11/05/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
11/05/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
11/05/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
11/10/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 11/6/08 by Ellen Smith.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal