Case Information: 53390 | |||
Short Caption: | RODRIGUEZ VS. PRATTI (CHILD CUSTODY) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D400818 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Child Custody/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 06/01/2009 | How Submitted: | |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/10/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/10/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) | 09-06145 | |
03/23/2009 | Brief | Filed Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 09-07299 | |
03/23/2009 | Transcript Request | Filed Civil Proper Person Transcript Request Form. | 09-07300 | |
05/06/2009 | Other Incoming Document | Filed Proper Person Document. Change of Address. | 09-11288 | |
05/07/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 30 days. | 09-11334 | |
05/27/2009 | Other | Returned Mail. Order filed 5/07/09 addressed to Joseph Rodriguez. Remailed to corrected address. | 09-13214 | |
06/01/2009 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. | 09-13581 | |
06/01/2009 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
06/03/2009 | Other | Returned Mail. Order filed 5/7/09 addressed to Joseph Rodriguez. Order was remailed to address updated per notice from Mr. Rodriguez. Per USPS "attempted not known, unable to forward". | 09-13968 | |
06/10/2009 | Other | Returned Mail. Rec for Docs 6/1/09 addressed to Joseph Rodriguez. Per USPS "attempted not known, unable to forward". | 09-14534 | |
08/13/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Directing Response. Each respondent's response due: 30 days. | 09-19693 | |
09/10/2009 | Brief | Filed Response to Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 09-21914 | |
09/10/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief. | 09-21915 | |
09/16/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. Respondent's Answering Brief and Appendix served on Appellant Joseph Rodriguez. (copy of letter to Mr. Rodriguez attached) | 09-22419 | |
10/08/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP09-MC/MD/MG | 09-24628 | |
11/03/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-26407 | |
11/03/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
11/18/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 9, 2009. | 09-26407 |