Case Information: 53384 | |||
Short Caption: | BEHL VS. MOTHERWAY | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0502543 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 03/17/2009 / Cashill, Wm. | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/09/2009 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Stephenson & Dickinson, P.C. check no. 16399. | ||
03/09/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 09-05941 | |
03/17/2009 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Wm. Patterson Cashill. | 09-06760 | |
03/23/2009 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 09-07235 | |
03/23/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. -Docketing Statement Served on Settlement Judge. | 09-07236 | |
04/16/2009 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. Counsel are scheduled to participate in a telephone conference with the settlement judge on 4/20/09. Following that, a supplemental report will be filed. | 09-09597 | |
07/24/2009 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/Settlement. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter and will be forwarding appropriate documents to dismiss this appeal. | 09-18185 | |
07/30/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Stipulation or motion to dismiss due: 30 days. | 09-18613 | |
09/25/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. Appellants have not responded to our 7/30/09 order to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss. Accordingly, cause appearing, "we dismiss this appeal as abandoned." NNP09-MC/NS/MG | 09-23409 | |
10/20/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-24114 | |
10/20/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
10/27/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 21, 2009. | 09-24114 |