judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JONES (JOHNNY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 49525
Short Caption:JONES (JOHNNY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 46667 , 52443 , 52939 , 54940 , 56929 , 58096 , 65191 , 65238 , 69043 , 69043-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C199046Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:08/06/2007How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/25/2007Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
05/25/2007Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 07-11556
06/06/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 90 days. 07-12316
08/06/2007Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. 07-17262
08/06/2007Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
11/08/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED IN PART AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." Fn5 [This order constitutes our final disposition of this appeal. Any subsequent appeal from an order of the district court denying Jones's appeal deprivation claim and the claims not reached in this order shall be docketed as a new matter.] SNP08-JH/RP/MD. 07-24471
12/04/2007RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 07-26056
12/04/2007Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/19/2007RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 6, 2007. 07-26056