Case Information: 49494 | |||
Short Caption: | POLLARD (KEVIN) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 49495 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C219463 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 06/18/2007 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/23/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
05/23/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 07-11336 | |
06/06/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 30 days. | 07-12312 | |
06/18/2007 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. | 07-13315 | |
06/18/2007 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
07/02/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Administratively Closing Appeal in Docket No. 49495 and transferred original documents filed or received in this matter to Docket No. 49494. Nos. 49494/49495-cases are not consolidated. | 07-14372 | |
07/02/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Originally filed in docket no. 49495 on May 23, 2007.) | 07-14376 | |
07/02/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion. Clark County Public Defender's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record Because the Public Defender Does Not Handle the Appeal of Post-Conviction Relief Matters. (Originally filed in Docket No. 49495 on June 11, 2007.) | 07-14378 | |
07/02/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. This matter shall proceed as a proper person appeal. (Originally filed in Docket No. 49495 on June 18, 2007.) | 07-14379 | |
07/24/2007 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED in part and we DISMISS the appeal in part." NNP07-RP/JH/NS. | 07-16135 | |
08/21/2007 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 07-16534 | |
08/21/2007 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
08/28/2007 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 23, 2007. | 07-16534 |