judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

TURNER VS. CITY OF NORTH LAS VEGAS

Case Information: 53401
Short Caption:TURNER VS. CITY OF NORTH LAS VEGASCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A560138Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:03/20/2009 / Trost, JanetSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/11/2009Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Cal J. Potter, III, Esq. Chtd. check no. 25140.
03/11/2009Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) 09-06255
03/20/2009Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Janet Trost 09-07065
03/24/2009Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 09-07380
04/13/2009Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 4/14/09 09-09293
04/20/2009Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 09-09821
04/20/2009MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Pursuant to Settlement Conference 09-09822
04/27/2009Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). CLK- SNP-TH 09-10325
04/27/2009Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.