Case Information: 53400 | |||
Short Caption: | IN RE: DISCIPLINE OF KENNETH LONG | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | NONE | Classification: | Bar Matter - Discipline - Petition |
Disqualifications: | Saitta | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | En Banc | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 04/16/2009 | How Submitted: | |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/11/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/11/2009 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Saitta. | ||
03/11/2009 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record of Bar Proceedings. Vols. 1 through 3. | 09-06228 | |
03/11/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Briefing Schedule/Bar Discipline. | 09-06230 | |
04/15/2009 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 09-09444 | |
04/16/2009 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
02/16/2010 | Order/Dispositional Bar | Filed Bar Discipline Order. Rejecting Revised Conditional Guilty Plea and Remanding for Further Disciplinary Proceedings. fn4[This order constitutes our final action in this proceeding. When the State Bar again forwards this matter to this court, it shall be docketed as a new proceeding in this court.] fn5[The Honorable Nancy Saitta, Justice, voluntarily recused herself from participation in the decision of this matter.] | 10-05278 | |
03/16/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 10-06886 | |
03/16/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. |