judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ADAMSON VS. WALASEK

Case Information: 49513
Short Caption:ADAMSON VS. WALASEKCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A492566Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:ParraguirreCase Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:06/06/2007 / Trost, JanetSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/24/2007OtherDisqualification of Justice Parraguirre. Sat in district court proceedings.
05/24/2007Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
05/24/2007Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) 07-11512
05/24/2007Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days 07-11514
06/04/2007Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Flangas McMillan Law Group, Inc.--check no. 7087.
06/06/2007Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Janet Trost. 07-12334
06/20/2007Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. 07-13504
07/02/2007Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. 07-14404
07/02/2007Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/Settlement. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 07-14405
07/09/2007Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 07-14893
07/26/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). SNP/CLK 07-16454
07/26/2007Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.